This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2020 at 09:13:47 (UTC).

Ramirez v. Sabio

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Ramirez filed an Other lawsuit against Sabio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02172

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez

Respondent

Elma De Leon Sabio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jordan F. E. Dunham

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 International Drive, Suite 700

Baltimore, MD 21202

Michael Jay Schrier

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

505 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) STATUS REPORT by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#25

(#25) STATUS REPORT by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#24

(#24) STATUS REPORT by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#23

(#23) ORDER quashing the #20 failure to appear warrant. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/1/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#22

(#22) EXHIBIT LIST by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER directing the Court's August 28, 2020 #19 Order be SEALED. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/31/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#20

(#20) WARRANT of Arrest issued. (c/em to USMS 8/31/20 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#19

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#18

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and C to Verified Petition by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez Summons (Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STATUS REPORT by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STATUS REPORT by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORT by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER quashing the #20 failure to appear warrant. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/1/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) EXHIBIT LIST by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER directing the Court's August 28, 2020 #19 Order be SEALED. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/31/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WARRANT of Arrest issued. (c/em to USMS 8/31/20 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SEALED ORDER directing M.C. shall be immediately returned to the case and custody of Petitioner in Honduras. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/28/2020. (c/m & c/em to USMS 8/31/20 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2020 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ne exeat filed by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez before Judge George Levi Russell, III.(Court Reporter: Nadine Gazic) (J. Herndons, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/26/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER NE EXEAT. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/30/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued 21 days as to Elma De Leon Sabio.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez Summons (Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketTelephone Conference re: TRO held on 7/28/2020 before Judge George Levi Russell, III.(NOT RECORDED) (kmts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ne exeat by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Attorney Cert, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and C to Verified Petition by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibits A and C to Verified Petition by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Petition for Return of Child against Elma De Leon Sabio ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8774806.), filed by Mardoqueo Cabrera Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Dunham, Jordan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Schrier