This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2020 at 08:11:26 (UTC).

Ernestina Ramirez v. Capstone Logistics, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 Ernestina Ramirez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Capstone Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03285

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernestina Ramirez

Defendants

Capstone Logistics, LLC

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Alexander De Sario

Michael Nourmand

Melissa Misao Kurata

Defendant Attorneys

Justin T Curley

Daniel C Whang

Alexandra S Oxyer

Jennifer A Riley

Gerald L Maatman, Jr

Megha Jonnalagadda Charalambides

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

34 #1

Proposed Order

#34

#33

#30

29 #1

Proposed Order

#29

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit 1-c

1 #3

Exhibit 1-b

1 #2

Exhibit 1-a

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal

#1

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER VACATINGSCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu, re Notice of Settlement #36 . Pursuant to the Parties' stipulation and in light of the Parties' individual settlement of this matter, the Scheduling Conference scheduled for May 28, 2020 is vacated. The Court sets an Order to Show re: Settlement Hearing for June 29, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised the hearing will be vacated, and no appearance will be required provided a stipulation to dismiss, is filed by noon on June 26, 2020. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) and Request to Vacate Scheduling Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney Alexandra S. Oxyer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Capstone Logistics LLC, designating Daniel C. Whang as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexandra S. Oxyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 4/17/2020, Receipt No. 26124158) filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexandra S. Oxyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26124158) #29 , for the following reasons: For reasons stated in the Notice #30 filed on April 17, 2020. (lc) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for May 28, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than May 14, 2020. See Local Rule 26-1. (lom) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. See order for details. (lom) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexandra S. Oxyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26124158) #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): IL missing. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) (STRICKEN PER 4/17/20 ORDER DOCKET NO. 33). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexandra S. Oxyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26124158) filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whang, Daniel) Modified on 4/17/2020 (lc). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Capstone Logistics LLC, designating Daniel C. Whang as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Does 1 through 100, Inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ernestina Ramirez. Filed in State Court on 2/20/20 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #8 served on April 8, 2020. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on April 8, 2020. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC, identifying 1. Ernestina Ramirez, Plaintiff 2. Capstone Logistics, LLC, Defendant. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Justin Curley re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Meghan Nagel re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Cindy Davis re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV06608 Receipt No: ACACDC-26017168 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1-a, #3 Exhibit 1-b, #4 Exhibit 1-c, #5 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Justin T Curley added to party Capstone Logistics, LLC(pty:dft))(Curley, Justin) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less