This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:46:49 (UTC).

RAMIREZ MENDOZA v. FERRO et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 RAMIREZ MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FERRO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00415

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANA CLAUDIA RAMIREZ MENDOZA

Defendants

MICHAEL FERRO

CELADON GROUP, INC.

CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES, INC.

CELADON TRUCKING SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOAH B. ABRAMS

Attorney at ABRAMS & ABRAMS, P.A.

1526 Glenwood Avenue.

Raleigh, NC 27608

DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR.

Attorney at EISENBERG, ROTHWEILER, WINKLER, EISENBERG & JECK P.C.

1634 Spruce Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DOUGLAS B. ABRAMS

Attorney at ABRAMS & ABRAMS, P.A.

1526 Glenwood Avenue.

Raleigh, NC 27608

Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY N. SPROUT

Attorney at PION NERONE GIRMAN WINSLOW & SMITH PC

240 North 3Rd Street 10Th Fl

Harrisburg, PA 17101

JOHN T. PION

Attorney at PION, NERONE, GIRMAN, WINSLOW & SMITH, P.C.

Payne Shoemaker Bldg., 10Th Floor, 240 North Third Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

JAMES WEST BRYAN

Attorney at NEXSEN PRUET, PLLC

Pob 3463

Greensboro, NC 27402

JAMES DECINTI

Attorney at PION NERONE GIRMAN WINSLOW & SMITH PC

Payne Shoemaker Bldg 10Th Fl, 240 North Third St

Harrisburg, PA 17101

STEPHANIE L. HERSPERGER

Attorney at PION, NERONE, GIRMAN, WINSLOW & SMITH, P.C.

Payne Shoemaker Bldg 10Th Floor, 240 North Third Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

BRETT M. BECKER

Attorney at NEXSEN PRUET, PLLC

Pob 3463

Greensboro, NC 27402

GARY L. BEAVER

Attorney at NEXSEN PRUET, PLLC

701 Green Valley Rd., Ste. 100

Greensboro, NC 27408

DIANE BERNOFF SHER

Attorney at FINEMAN KREKSTEIN & HARRIS

Ten Penn Center, 1801 Mrket St Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JUNE J. ESSIS

Attorney at WEBER GALLAGHER

2000 Market Street, Suite 1300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

47 #1

Exhibit Acceptance of Service

#47

(#47) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to MICHAEL FERRO served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(ABRAMS, NOAH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#46

(#46) Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 7/25/2019 (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#45

(#45) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by all parties. Est. Trial Days: 7 by All Defendants.(BRYAN, JAMES) Modified on 6/24/2019 to reflect document is a Joint Rule 26(f) report. (Marsh, Keah) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#44

(#44) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL FERRO. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#43

(#43) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/17/2019. The Summons as to Defendant Ferro attached in (D.E. #42 ) as Exhibit A is hereby issued. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

42 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

42 #1

Exhibit Summons

#42

(#42) MOTION for Issuance of Summons by DIANA CLAUDIA RAMIREZ MENDOZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ABRAMS, NOAH) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

4 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#4

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Stay Responsive Briefings to Defendant Ferro's September 6, 2018 Rule 12 Motion Pending a Ruling on Plaintiff's Forthcoming Motion to Remand , on behalf of Defendant Michael Ferro filed by MICHAEL FERRO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay)(HERSPERGER, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#3

(#3) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Transfer Venue of Defendant, Michael Ferro filed by CELADON GROUP, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICE, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES, INC.. (ESSIS, JUNE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

2 #2

Brief of Defendant, Michael Ferro, in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order corresponding to Motion of Defendant, Michael Ferro, to

#2

(#3) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Transfer Venue of Defendant, Michael Ferro filed by CELADON GROUP, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICE, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES, INC.. (ESSIS, JUNE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

1 #1

Designation Form

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL FERRO from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 171003249. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184280) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to MICHAEL FERRO served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(ABRAMS, NOAH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 7/25/2019 (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred: RE: #45 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Marsh, Keah) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by all parties. Est. Trial Days: 7 by All Defendants.(BRYAN, JAMES) Modified on 6/24/2019 to reflect document is a Joint Rule 26(f) report. (Marsh, Keah) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL FERRO. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/17/2019. The Summons as to Defendant Ferro attached in (D.E. #42 ) as Exhibit A is hereby issued. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Referred: RE: #42 MOTION for Issuance of Summons, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MOTION for Issuance of Summons by DIANA CLAUDIA RAMIREZ MENDOZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ABRAMS, NOAH) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GARY L. BEAVER on behalf of Defendants CELADON GROUP, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICE, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES, INC., MICHAEL FERRO (BEAVER, GARY) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DOUGLAS B. ABRAMS on behalf of Plaintiff DIANA CLAUDIA RAMIREZ MENDOZA (ABRAMS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE BERNOFF SHER on behalf of CELADON GROUP, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICE, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES, INC. (SHER, DIANE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/19/18. 9/19/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Stay Responsive Briefings to Defendant Ferro's September 6, 2018 Rule 12 Motion Pending a Ruling on Plaintiff's Forthcoming Motion to Remand , on behalf of Defendant Michael Ferro filed by MICHAEL FERRO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay)(HERSPERGER, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES DECINTI on behalf of MICHAEL FERRO with Certificate of Service(DECINTI, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE L. HERSPERGER on behalf of MICHAEL FERRO with Certificate of Service(HERSPERGER, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Stay Responsive Briefings to Defendant Ferro's September 6, 2018 Rule 12 Motion Pending a Ruling on Plaintiff's Forthcoming Motion to Remand filed by DIANA CLAUDIA RAMIREZ MENDOZA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(SHERRY, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Transfer Venue of Defendant, Michael Ferro filed by CELADON GROUP, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICE, INC., CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES, INC.. (ESSIS, JUNE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Transfer Venue of Defendant, Michael Ferro filed by MICHAEL FERRO.Brief, & Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order corresponding to Motion of Defendant, Michael Ferro, to Transfer Venue, #2 Brief of Defendant, Michael Ferro, in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(PION, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL FERRO from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 171003249. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184280) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.