This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 07:26:55 (UTC).

Esmeralda Ramirez et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Esmeralda Ramirez filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00419

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Esmeralda Ramirez

Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez

Gustavo Ortiz

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Radomir Roger Kirnos

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daniel Max Kalinowski

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLC

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Maite Christine Colon

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

14 #8

Exhibit G

14 #7

Exhibit F

14 #6

Exhibit E

14 #5

Exhibit D

14 #4

Exhibit C

14 #3

Exhibit B

14 #2

Exhibit A

14 #1

Declaration of Daniel Kalinowski

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski counsel for Plaintiffs Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez, Esmeralda Ramirez. Adding Daniel Kalinowski as counsel of record for Esmeralda Ramirez and Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez AKA Gustavo Ortiz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Esmeralda Ramirez and Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez AKA Gustavo Ortiz. (Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Esmeralda Ramirez(pty:pla))(Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE filed by Defendant FCA US LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, #11 (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Amount in Controversy); Order CONTINUING Scheduling Conference to April 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Defendant removed this case and therefore bears the burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant is therefore ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, to be received by the Court no later than March 8, 2022, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to an insufficient amount in controversy. Failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in a remand without further warning. Plaintiffs may, but are not required to, file a written Reply to Defendant's Response, to be received by the Court no later than March 15, 2022. The parties should understand this Order to be a dual-pronged inquiry into both the facial sufficiency of Defendant's jurisdictional allegations as well as the factual sufficiency of Defendant's demonstration of the amount in controversy, which the Court now calls on Defendant to make. The parties are accordingly encouraged to submit declarations or other evidence in support of their jurisdictional contentions. Finally, to provide time to first address these jurisdictional questions, the Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to April 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. (lc) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 28, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez, Esmeralda Ramirez to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, #11 , Response #12 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Memorandum in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Kalinowski, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski counsel for Plaintiffs Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez, Esmeralda Ramirez. Adding Daniel Kalinowski as counsel of record for Esmeralda Ramirez and Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez AKA Gustavo Ortiz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Esmeralda Ramirez and Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez AKA Gustavo Ortiz. (Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Esmeralda Ramirez(pty:pla))(Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE filed by Defendant FCA US LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, #11 (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Amount in Controversy); Order CONTINUING Scheduling Conference to April 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Defendant removed this case and therefore bears the burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant is therefore ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, to be received by the Court no later than March 8, 2022, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to an insufficient amount in controversy. Failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in a remand without further warning. Plaintiffs may, but are not required to, file a written Reply to Defendant's Response, to be received by the Court no later than March 15, 2022. The parties should understand this Order to be a dual-pronged inquiry into both the facial sufficiency of Defendant's jurisdictional allegations as well as the factual sufficiency of Defendant's demonstration of the amount in controversy, which the Court now calls on Defendant to make. The parties are accordingly encouraged to submit declarations or other evidence in support of their jurisdictional contentions. Finally, to provide time to first address these jurisdictional questions, the Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to April 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. (lc) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 28, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/13/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Esmeralda Ramirez, Gustavo Ortiz Hernandez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/16/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV45978 Receipt No: ACACDC-32653175 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Millard Proudfoot