This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 08:03:51 (UTC).

Ramirez Escobar v. Midland Credit Management

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Ramirez Escobar filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Credit Management. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01264

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Ramirez Escobar

Defendant

Midland Credit Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Zemel

Attorney at Zemel Law LLC

1373 Broad Street, Suite 203-C

Clifton, NJ 07013

Defendant Attorneys

Concepcion A Montoya

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

800 Third Avenue, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Schuyler B Kraus

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - NNY

800 Third Avenue, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Schuyler B Kraus on behalf of Midland Credit Management (Kraus, Schuyler) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Concepcion A. Montoya to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5473649) by Midland Credit Management. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Schuyler Kraus in Support of the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Concepcion A. Montoya, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Concepcion A. Montoya for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Montoya, Concepcion) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Concepcion A. Montoya for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5398004.), filed by Jose Ramirez Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Jose Ramirez Escobar, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

8 #4

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Affidavit Certification of Schuyler Kraus in Support of the Application for Admi

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2019. Discovery due by 2/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

8 #3

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Concepcion A. Montoya. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Concepcion A. Montoya to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5473649) by Midland Credit Management. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Schuyler Kraus in Support of the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Concepcion A. Montoya, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Concepcion A. Montoya for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Montoya, Concepcion) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docket Entry Correction re 6 Notice of Appearance - Document filed in wrong case. (Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Schuyler B Kraus on behalf of Midland Credit Management (Kraus, Schuyler) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Jose Ramirez Escobar, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2019. Discovery due by 2/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5398004.), filed by Jose Ramirez Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.