This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:13:00 (UTC).

Ramhit v. Lyons et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Ramhit filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Lyons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10329

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Narine Ramhit

Defendants

Acting Atty. General Matthew G Whitaker

Yolanda Smith

Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN

Mr. Todd Lyons

Sheriff STEVEN W TOMPKINS

Todd Lyons

Steven W. Tompkins

Matthew G Whitaker

Kirstjen Nielsen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey B. Rubin

Attorney at Law Office of Jeffrey Rubin

One Center Plaza, Suite 230

Boston, MA 02108

Defendant Attorney

Thomas E. Kanwit

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

Suite 9200, 1 Courthouse Way, John Joseph Moakley Federal Courthouse

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The respondents shall, within 3 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition upon the respondents and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts.(PSSA, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) set for 2/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. THE HEARING IS CANCELLED. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition by Narine Ramhit.(Rubin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Todd Lyons, Kirstjen Nielsen, Yolanda Smith, Steven W. Tompkins, Matthew G Whitaker (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/19 to Respond to Petition by Todd Lyons, Kirstjen Nielsen, Yolanda Smith, Steven W. Tompkins, Matthew G Whitaker.(Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) :Hearing set for 2/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.The Court enters an Order that the petitioner not be removed from the District of MA until further order of the Court. Such order will be entered once the Court is sufficiently satisfied as to this Court's jurisdiction or lack thereof. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The respondents shall, within 3 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition upon the respondents and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts.(PSSA, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7548949 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Narine Ramhit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Appendix)(Rubin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.