This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2020 at 19:38:33 (UTC).

Ramelli et al v. Zahn et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Ramelli filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Zahn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01482

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc.

Robert C. Ramelli

Defendants

The City of Kenner

Ben Zahn

Kenner City

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick S. McGoey

Attorney at Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70112

McClain R. Schonekas

Attorney at Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Andrea V. Timpa

Attorney at Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Ellie T. Schilling

Attorney at Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

Edward Sebastian Rapier, Jr.

Attorney at City of Kenner

1801 Williams Blvd

Kenner, LA 70062

John W. Bihm

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Christopher K. LeMieux

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Michael R.C. Riess, Jr.

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Johanna Elizabeth Lambert

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

44 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#44

#43

40 #2

Proposed Order

#40

38 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

38 #2

Proposed Pleading

38 #1

Memorandum in Support

#38

1 #16

Summons The City of Kenner

1 #15

Summons Ben Zahn, individually and in his official capacity as Mayor of the City

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be completed by 3/22/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Bench Trial set for 6/21/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ecm) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Kenner City, Ben Zahn re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. (cwa) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 8/31/2020. (cwa) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Reply. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Kenner City, Ben Zahn. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(LeMieux, Christopher) Modified text/added referral on 8/31/2020 (am). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Robert C. Ramelli, Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc. re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses . (McGoey, Patrick) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Kenner City, Ben Zahn. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Notice of Submission)(LeMieux, Christopher) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Kenner City, Ben Zahn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(LeMieux, Christopher) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (am). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Counsel must call in to the conference at (877) 411-9748 andenter Access code 7562821. Issued by Clerk.(am) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #34 Motion to Enroll as additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Christopher K. LeMieux, Johanna Elizabeth Lambert, John W. Bihm, Michael R.C. Riess, Jr for Kenner City and for Ben Zahn. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/6/2020. (ecm) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc., Robert C. Ramelli. IT IS ORDERED that a telephone status conference is hereby SET for June 4, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel are instructed to call 888-273-3658 and use Access Code: 1304800 when instructed. The Court will join the call when all parties are on the line. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(Abu-Orf, Leila) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Manual Attachment Received (1 CD) re #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc., Robert C. Ramelli. (ecm) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert C. Ramelli, Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A. Declaration of Robert Ramelli with supporting Exhibits A-1 through A-14, #3 Exhibit B. Kenner Home Rule Charter 2.09, 2.13, 4.09, #4 Exhibit C. 02/21/20 Agenda, #5 Exhibit D. 03/05/20 Agenda, #6 Exhibit E. IV Waste Contract, #7 Exhibit F. Capitano Petition and Amended Petition, 24th JDC No. 806-019, #8 Exhibit G. Capitano Consent Order, #9 Exhibit H. Capitano Preliminary Injunction, #10 Exhibit I. Capitano Reasons for Judgment, #11 Exhibit J. Ramelli v. Kenner Petition, 24th JDC No. 806-208, #12 Exhibit K. Kenner Ordinances 7-90, 7-91, 7-98; and 7-171, #13 Exhibit L. Ramelli v. IV Waste Petition, CDC No. 20-3606, #14 Exhibit M. Ramelli v. IV Waste TRO, CDC No. 20-3606, #15 Exhibit N. Declaration of Patrick McGoey with supporting Exhibits N-1 through N-9, #16 Notice of Manual Attachment Video Exhibits A-3, A-5, A-6, A-8, A-9, A-10, A-14, #17 Proposed Order)(McGoey, Patrick) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Kenner City, Ben Zahn. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request of Summons Issued as to Kenner City filed by Robert C. Ramelli, Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. (McGoey, Patrick) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request of Summons Issued as to Ben Zahn filed by Robert C. Ramelli, Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. (McGoey, Patrick) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Kenner City, Ben Zahn. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc. (McGoey, Patrick) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The City of Kenner, Ben Zahn (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8309621) filed by Robert C. Ramelli, Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons Ben Zahn, individually and in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of Kenner, #16 Summons The City of Kenner)Attorney Patrick S. McGoey added to party Robert C. Ramelli(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick S. McGoey added to party Ramelli Janitorial Service, Inc.(pty:pla).(McGoey, Patrick) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kenner City is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McClain R Schonekas(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick S. McGoey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellie T. Schilling Esq.