This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:36:23 (UTC).

Rama et al v. Grdjic et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Rama filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Grdjic. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana L. Christensen and Jeremiah C. Lynch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

Referral Judge

Jeremiah C. Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sefedin Rama

Ljiljin Rama

Defendants

Ivica Bosnjak

New Prime Inc.

1677159 Ontario Inc.

Seven Star Express Line Ltd.

Ivica Bosnjok

Igor Grdjic

Robert Thomas Vanamburg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert A. Terrazas

Attorney at TERRAZAS CLARK HENKEL, P.C.

1923 S. Higgins Avenue, P.O. Box 9077

Missoula, MT 59807-9077

Eric Rasmusson

Attorney at TERRAZAS CLARK HENKEL, P.C.

1923 S. Higgins Avenue, P.O. Box 9077

Missoula, MT 59807-9077

Dana Ann Henkel

Attorney at TERRAZAS CLARK HENKEL, P.C.

1923 S. Higgins Avenue, P.O. Box 9077

Missoula, MT 59807-9077

Defendant Attorneys

David Matthew McLean

Attorney at McLEAN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

3301 Great Northern Ave., Suite 203

Missoula, MT 59808

Ryan C. Willmore

Attorney at McLEAN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

3301 Great Northern Ave., Suite 203

Missoula, MT 59808

Jared S. Dahle

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

Brian J. Smith

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

Leah T. Handelman

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER:. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Motions due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/11/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#17

(#17) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by 1677159 Ontario Inc., Ivica Bosnjak, Igor Grdjic, Seven Star Express Line Ltd.. (McLean, David) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#16

(#16) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#15

(#15) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#14

(#14) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#13

(#13) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by New Prime Inc., Robert Thomas Vanamburg. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#12

(#12) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel David Matthew McLean, Ryan C. Willmore, Brian J. Smith, Jared S. Dahle, Leah T. Handelman, Dana Ann Henkel, Robert A. Terrazas, Eric Rasmusson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/17/2019. (APP) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Thomas Vanamburg. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Ann Henkel on behalf of Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama (Henkel, Dana) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Of Eric Rasmusson by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons Ontario, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons Grdjic, #3 Exhibit 3-Bosnjak, #4 Exhibit 4-Seven Star) (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Leah T. Handelman on behalf of New Prime Inc. (Handelman, Leah) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendant ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury Trial by New Prime Inc.. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Prime Inc.. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#2

(#2) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/4/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/22/2019. (TCL) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime Inc. from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Mineral County, case number DV 2016-46., filed by New Prime Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING ORDER:. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Motions due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/11/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • (#18) MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/11/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by 1677159 Ontario Inc., Ivica Bosnjak, Igor Grdjic, Seven Star Express Line Ltd.. (McLean, David) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by New Prime Inc., Robert Thomas Vanamburg. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel David Matthew McLean, Ryan C. Willmore, Brian J. Smith, Jared S. Dahle, Leah T. Handelman, Dana Ann Henkel, Robert A. Terrazas, Eric Rasmusson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/17/2019. (APP) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Thomas Vanamburg. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Ann Henkel on behalf of Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama (Henkel, Dana) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Eric Rasmusson by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 -Ltr Mineral County Clerk, #2 Exhibit 6-Ltr MT SOS) (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1677159 Ontario Inc., Seven Star Express Line Ltd.. (McLean, David) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by 1677159 Ontario Inc., Ivica Bosnjak, Igor Grdjic, Seven Star Express Line Ltd.. (McLean, David) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Of Eric Rasmusson by Ljiljin Rama, Sefedin Rama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons Ontario, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons Grdjic, #3 Exhibit 3-Bosnjak, #4 Exhibit 4-Seven Star) (Rasmusson, Eric) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Leah T. Handelman on behalf of New Prime Inc. (Handelman, Leah) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury Trial by New Prime Inc.. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Prime Inc.. (Dahle, Jared) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/4/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/22/2019. (TCL) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2281624. (NOS) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime Inc. from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Mineral County, case number DV 2016-46., filed by New Prime Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.