This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 12:36:03 (UTC).

Ralston v. American Signature, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Ralston filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against American Signature, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claria Horn Boom and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00604

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claria Horn Boom

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nichelle Ralston

Defendant

American Signature, Inc. doing business as Value City Furniture

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Donald L. Miller, II

Francisco D. Savinon, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Discovery

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/23/2020 granting #10 Motion for Attorney Stanley Brenton to Withdraw. cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RENEWED MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiff Nichelle Ralston (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stanley, Brenton) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/12/2020 granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion is is GRANTED as to Lauren E. Marley and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Brenton Stanley. Stanley shall file a renewed motion to withdraw that comports with LR 83.6 on or before 10/23/2020. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Lauren E. Marley and Brenton Stanley. (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Plaintiff Nichelle Ralston (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Marley, Lauren) Modified on 10/5/2020 to clarify text (ALS). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/29/2020; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Counsel shall confirm participation in the conference by providing a direct dial telephone number to Magistrate Judge Lindsay's Case Manager. cc: Counsel (ALS) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/29/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Marley on behalf of Nichelle Ralston (Marley, Lauren) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (DLW) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DLW) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint previously filed in state court action by American Signature, Inc. (DLW) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Signature, Inc. (DLW) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Signature, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-003153. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3171381). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Discovery, #3 Cover Sheet) (DLW) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less