This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2020 at 12:03:05 (UTC).

Ralph Ledergerber v. Netease, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 Ralph Ledergerber filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Netease, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00862

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ralph Ledergerber

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10

Netease, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Frank Gregory Casella

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Jonathan Oldham Ballard

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs PC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy T Elman

Attorney at White and Case LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Two Palo Alto Square Suite 900

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Timothy F Keegan

Attorney at White and Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Stefan Mentzer

Attorney at White and Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Daniel Ledesma

Attorney at White and Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Matthew P Lewis

Attorney at White and Case LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2433

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Ledesma APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Netease, Inc., designating Matthew P Lewis as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy F Keegan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Netease, Inc., designating Matthew P Lewis as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Stefan M Mentzer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Netease, Inc, designating Matthew P Lewis as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Ledesma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Netease, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25714995) filed by Defendant Netease, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy F. Keegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Netease, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25714415) filed by Defendant Netease, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan M. Mentzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Netease, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25677653) filed by Defendant Netease, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Netease, Inc. answer now due 4/17/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Netease, Inc..(Elman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy T Elman counsel for Defendant Netease, Inc.. Adding Jeremy T. Elman as counsel of record for NetEase, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NetEase, Inc.. (Attorney Jeremy T Elman added to party Netease, Inc.(pty:dft))(Elman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew P Lewis counsel for Defendant Netease, Inc.. Adding Matthew Lewis as counsel of record for NetEase, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NetEase, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew P Lewis added to party Netease, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ralph Ledergerber, upon Defendant Netease, Inc. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rachel Nyman, Secretary of Netease, Inc. Administrator in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M Doniger counsel for Plaintiff Ralph Ledergerber. Jonathan Ballard is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ralph Ledergerber. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Netease, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ralph Ledergerber. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Ralph Ledergerber. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ralph Ledergerber, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ralph Ledergerber. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25207781 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ralph Ledergerber. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Ralph Ledergerber(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NETEASE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL LEDESMA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew P Lewis