This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 08:57:32 (UTC).

Raleigh v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Raleigh filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00759

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reid Raleigh

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Nord

Attorney at SAGE LAW PARTNERS LLC

140 N Union Ave Ste 220

Farmington, UT 84025

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha E. Wilcox

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Mark L. Anderson

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

14 #4

Exhibit D - Corporate Disclosure Statement

14 #3

Exhibit C - Email

14 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

14 #1

Exhibit A - Docket

#14

#13

#12

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

2 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure

2 #2

Exhibit Ex 2 - Complaint

2 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - Docket

#2

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 200906686, against Reid Raleigh. filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Email, #4 Exhibit D - Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER to Amend #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. See order. Amended notice must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/16/20. (alf) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/13/2021. Motions due by 10/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/16/20. (alf) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiff Reid Raleigh per Report of Attorney Planning Meeting #10 . (alf) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Nord, Ryan) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance.(Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/3/20. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#6) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Reid Raleigh. (alf) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiff Reid Raleigh. Form due by 11/17/2020. (alf) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and applicable State Court Returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint, Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiff Reid Raleigh. (jl) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 200906686, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3780843) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (jl) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Nord