This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2020 at 09:21:42 (UTC).

Rakow v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Rakow filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr, Alistair Newbern and Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00607

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judges

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly D. Rakow

Defendants

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman

3710 Rawlins, Suite 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

Charles Silvestri Higgins

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 N Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Lani D. Lester

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 N Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Kristi Wood

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood St., Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

William W. Drinkwater

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP (Nashville Office)

150 Fourth Avenue, N, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Shane G. Ramsey

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP (Nashville Office)

One Nashville Place, 150 Fourth Avenue, North, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT Statement filed by Kelly D. Rakow in support of #17 Order,,, Terminate Hearings,,, Set Hearings,,. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc..(Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 14, 2020 is hereby RESET for October 5, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. This conference will take place telephonically. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they should call in order to participate in the telephone conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice of Kristi Wood is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 08/23/2020.(vk) (Entered: 08/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #11 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(c), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura Baughman is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 08/23/2020.(vk) (Entered: 08/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Shane G. Ramsey, William W. Drinkwater. (mg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drinkwater on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Drinkwater, William) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketTX State Bar status verified as active for Kristi Wood. (mg) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for attorney Kristi Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3193466) by Kelly D. Rakow. (Lester, Lani) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Upon the reassignment of this case to Judge Trauger, the reference to the magistrate judge is hereby WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before her on August 25, 2020 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her on September 14, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/20/2020. (mg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:15-cv-00533. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/17/2020. (mg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Laura J. Baughman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 8/6/2020. (mg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Laura J. Baughman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/6/2020. (mg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketTX State Bar status verified as active for Laura J. Baughman. (mg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **WITHDRAWN See Order #7 *** NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) Modified on 7/20/2020 (mg). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3177659), filed by Kelly D. Rakow. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi Wood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Silvestri Higgins