This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:43:19 (UTC).

Rainey v. Perkins Township Board of Trustees et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Rainey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Perkins Township Board of Trustees. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dannie Rainey

Sandusky, OH 44870

Defendants

Perkins Township Board of Trustees

Perkins Township Police Department

Joseph Bauman

Brent Adams

Joshua Lanyi

Joseph Rotuno

Detective McDermott

Timothy Alexander

Law Director for the City of Sandusky

Brendan Heil

A.P. Lilly

Yvette Thompson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Edmond Z. Jaber

Attorney at Mazanec Raskin Ryder

34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

John D. Pinzone

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland

100 Franklin'S Row, 34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

John D. Latchney

Attorney at Hanna, Campbell & Powell

3737 Embassy Parkway

Akron, OH 44333

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Brendan Heil, Law Director for the City of Sandusky. (Latchney, John) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#8

(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Brent Adams, Timothy Alexander, Joseph Bauman, Joshua Lanyi, McDermott, Perkins Township Board of Trustees, Perkins Township Police Department, Joseph Rotuno. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

7 #7

Appendix City of Sandusky Charter Section 17 re Law Director

7 #6

Appendix Sandusky Municipal Court Notice of Hearing w/Rainey's defense coun

7 #5

Appendix Perkins Township Police Report

7 #4

Appendix Criminal Docket for 1985 Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court case

7 #3

Appendix 1999 Indictment, Conviction & Sentencing in Lorain County Common Pleas

7 #2

Appendix 1992 Indictment, Conviction & Sentencing Judgment Entry in Lorain Count

7 #1

Appendix 1985 Judgment Entry of Conviction & Sentencing in Cuyahoga County Commo

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Motion for extension of time until March 10, 2022 to answer Move or Plead to Complaint filed by Brent Adams, Timothy Alexander, Joseph Bauman, Joshua Lanyi, McDermott, Perkins Township Board of Trustees, Perkins Township Police Department, Joseph Rotuno. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Yvette Thompson on 1/15/2022, filed on behalf of Dannie Rainey Related document(s) #2 . (R,EM) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

2 #2

Correct Summons for Timothy Alexander

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

2 #2

Main Document

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Brendan Heil, Law Director for the City of Sandusky. (Latchney, John) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Brent Adams, Timothy Alexander, Joseph Bauman, Joshua Lanyi, McDermott, Perkins Township Board of Trustees, Perkins Township Police Department, Joseph Rotuno. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting defendants' Brent Adams, Timothy Alexander, Joseph Bauman, Joshua Lanyi, McDermott, Perkins Township Board of Trustees, Perkins Township Police Department, and Joseph Rotuno's answer due 3/10/2022. #6 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/8/2022.(S,AL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Brendan Heil, Law Director for the City of Sandusky. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1985 Judgment Entry of Conviction & Sentencing in Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, #2 Appendix 1992 Indictment, Conviction & Sentencing Judgment Entry in Lorain County Common Pleas Court, #3 Appendix 1999 Indictment, Conviction & Sentencing in Lorain County Common Pleas Court, #4 Appendix Criminal Docket for 1985 Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court case, #5 Appendix Perkins Township Police Report, #6 Appendix Sandusky Municipal Court Notice of Hearing w/Rainey's defense counsel listed, #7 Appendix City of Sandusky Charter Section 17 re Law Director)(Latchney, John) Modified on 2/8/2022 (K,AR). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for extension of time until March 10, 2022 to answer Move or Plead to Complaint filed by Brent Adams, Timothy Alexander, Joseph Bauman, Joshua Lanyi, McDermott, Perkins Township Board of Trustees, Perkins Township Police Department, Joseph Rotuno. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Yvette Thompson on 1/15/2022, filed on behalf of Dannie Rainey Related document(s) #2 . (R,EM) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Brent Adams, stamped on 1/18/2022; Timothy Alexander, stamped on 1/18/2022; Joseph Bauman, stamped on 1/18/2022; Brendan Heil on 1/18/2022; Joshua Lanyi, stamped on 1/18/2022; Law Director for the City of Sandusky on 1/18/2022; A.P. Lilly on 1/14/2022; McDermott, stamped on on 1/18/2022; Perkins Township Board of Trustees, stamped on 1/18/2022; Perkins Township Police Department, stamped on 1/18/2022; Joseph Rotuno, stamped on 1/18/2022, filed on behalf of Dannie Rainey Related document(s) #2 . (H,JL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion File Electronically filed by Plaintiff Dannie Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Dannie Smith)(K,AR) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Brent Adams Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0271 5208, Timothy Alexander Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9818, Joseph Bauman Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0271 5215, Brendan Heil Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9764, Joshua Lanyi Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0271 5192, Law Director for the City of Sandusky Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9771, A.P. Lilly Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9757, McDermott Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9825, Perkins Township Board of Trustees Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0271 7080, Perkins Township Police Department Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9788, Joseph Rotuno Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9832, Yvette Thompson Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9740 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 1290 0002 0270 9764. (K,AR) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Brent Adams, Timothy Alexander, Joseph Bauman, Brendan Heil, Joshua Lanyi, Law Director for the City of Sandusky, A.P. Lilly, McDermott, Perkins Township Board of Trustees, Perkins Township Police Department, Joseph Rotuno, Yvette Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Correct Summons for Timothy Alexander) (K,AR). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Brent Adams, Timothy Alexander, Joseph Bauman, Brendan Heil, Joshua Lanyi, Law Director for th City of Sandusky, A.P. Lilly, McDermott, Perkins Township Board of Trustees, Perkins Township Police Department, Joseph Rotuno, Yvette Thompson. Filing fee paid. 402.00. Receipt # 34660012843. Filed by Dannie Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (K,AR) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edmond Z. Jaber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Pinzone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Latchney