This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 12:08:44 (UTC).

Raines v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Raines filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U-Haul International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01368

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jykeecia Raines

Defendants

U-Haul International, Inc.

U-Haul Co. of Georgia doing business as U-Haul Moving & Storage of College Park at Godby Road

U-Haul Moving & Storage Of College Park At Godby Road

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Ward Howard

Attorney at The Howard Law Firm

1479 Brockett Road, Suite 200

Tucker, GA 30084

Leif Andrew Howard

Attorney at The Howard Law Firm

1479 Brockett Road, Suite 200

Tucker, GA 30084

Sharon Effatt Howard

Attorney at The Howard Law Firm

1479 Brockett Road, Suite 200

Tucker, GA 30084

Defendant Attorney

Whitney Lay Greene

Attorney at Drew Eckl & Farnham - ATL

Suite 3500, 303 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to U-Haul International, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to U-Haul Co. of Georgia. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#4

(#4) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11717457. (Howard, James) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/20/22. (ceo) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Jykeecia Raines. U-Haul Co. of Georgia served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. (Howard, James) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by Jykeecia Raines. U-Haul International, Inc. served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Howard, James) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries by U-Haul Co. of Georgia and U-Haul International, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/17/2022.(Greene, Whitney) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/20/2022 in order to add filing party (anc). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendants by Jykeecia Raines. (Howard, James) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#11

(#11) OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default by U-Haul Co. of Georgia, U-Haul International, Inc.. (Greene, Whitney) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Brief Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Jykeecia Raines. (Howard, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendants, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (anc) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE re #11 Objection to Motion for Entry of Default filed by Jykeecia Raines. (Howard, James) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by U-Haul Co. of Georgia, U-Haul International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Greene, Whitney) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default by U-Haul Co. of Georgia, U-Haul International, Inc.. (Greene, Whitney) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendants by Jykeecia Raines. (Howard, James) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries by U-Haul Co. of Georgia and U-Haul International, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/17/2022.(Greene, Whitney) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/20/2022 in order to add filing party (anc). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: Because it appears that Plaintiff has successfully served the defendants, Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Service of Process by U.S. Marshals #5 is DENIED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/2/22. (ceo) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #5 MOTION for Service of Process by U.S. Marshals, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by Jykeecia Raines. U-Haul International, Inc. served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Howard, James) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Jykeecia Raines. U-Haul Co. of Georgia served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. (Howard, James) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/20/22. (ceo) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Service of Process by U.S. Marshals by Jykeecia Raines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, James) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Approval re #4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11717457. (Howard, James) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to U-Haul Co. of Georgia. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to U-Haul International, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jykeecia Raines. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11717480) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-Haul Co of Colorado is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney Lay Greene(Designation Retained)