This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2022 at 09:05:56 (UTC).

Raines v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 Raines filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04150

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christine Raines

Defendant

Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Talia Ravis

Defendant Attorneys

Mark E. McFarland

Nathan Lusignan

Alnisa Bell

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bruce Waugh(Lusignan, Nathan) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#20

(#20) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 11/30/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

19 #1

Memo on PTC

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/19/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2023. Signed on 11/30/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#18

(#18) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Christine Raines. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#16

(#16) Motion to allow Alnisa Bell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8197861) filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America. (McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#15

(#15) Motion to allow Nathan P. Lusignan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8197843) filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America. (McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#14

(#14) First DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#13

(#13) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attorney Mark E. McFarland added to party Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Christine Raines. Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company Cafeteria and Welfare Plan served on 10/21/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Christine Raines. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 10/24/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Ravis, Talia) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/27/2022 to remove blank page) (Warren, Melissa). (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/14/2022

DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bruce Waugh(Lusignan, Nathan) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 11/30/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/19/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2023. Signed on 11/30/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Christine Raines. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 & #16 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Nathan Lusignan and Alnisa Bell for Prudential Insurance Company of America allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Motion to allow Alnisa Bell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8197861) filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America. (McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Motion to allow Nathan P. Lusignan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8197843) filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America. (McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) First DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Mark E. McFarland on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attorney Mark E. McFarland added to party Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(McFarland, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Christine Raines. Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company Cafeteria and Welfare Plan served on 10/21/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Christine Raines. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 10/24/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Ravis, Talia) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/27/2022 to remove blank page) (Warren, Melissa). (Entered: 10/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company Cafeteria and Welfare Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America. Summons directed to plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 11/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

Docket(#2) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 10/19/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Minkler, Kaitlin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Talia Ravis on behalf of Christine Raines. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8156646. Service due by 1/17/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less