This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:18:23 (UTC).

Raines et al v. NPD, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Raines filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against NPD, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leo I. Brisbois and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02925

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tim McGough

John Raines

North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters

North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, the

Defendants

NPD, Inc.

John Koralia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda R Cefalu

Attorney at Kutak Rock

60 South Sixth Street, Ste 3400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Nathan T Boone

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

60 South Sixth Street, Suite 3400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorney

John F Hedtke

Attorney at Hedtke Law Office

1217 E 1St St.

Duluth, MN 55805

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by John Koralia, NPD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hedtke, John) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, the, John Raines(as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), Tim McGough, John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors). NPD, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Cefalu, Amanda) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, the, John Raines(as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), Tim McGough, John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors). John Koralia served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Cefalu, Amanda) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to John Koralia, NPD, Inc.. (kt) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Koralia, NPD, Inc. (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7281111) filed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, John Raines (as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), Tim McGough (as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), John Raines (as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors). Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cefalu, Amanda) Modified text on 11/21/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by John Koralia, NPD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hedtke, John) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, the, John Raines(as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), Tim McGough, John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors). John Koralia served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Cefalu, Amanda) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, the, John Raines(as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), Tim McGough, John Raines(as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors). NPD, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Cefalu, Amanda) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to John Koralia, NPD, Inc.. (kt) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Fifth Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2925 SRN/LIB. (kt) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Koralia, NPD, Inc. (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7281111) filed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, John Raines (as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), Tim McGough (as Trustees of the Carpenters & Joiners Welfare Fund and Twin City Carpenters Pension Master Trust Fund), John Raines (as Trustee of the Carpenters and Joiners Apprenticeship and Journeymen Training Trust Fund, and each of their successors). Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cefalu, Amanda) Modified text on 11/21/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.