This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 09:21:45 (UTC).

Raindrops Licensing LLC v. Pandora Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Raindrops Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Pandora Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raindrops Licensing LLC

Defendant

Pandora Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie E. O'Byrne

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

David Ellis Moore

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 23, 2020 - filed by Pandora Media, LLC. (O'Byrne, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2020 - filed by Pandora Media, LLC. (Moore, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Franklin D. Kang - filed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. Pandora Media, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,609,096. (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Pandora Media, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3098294.) - filed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 23, 2020 filed by Pandora Media, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/20. (ntl) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 23, 2020 - filed by Pandora Media, LLC. (O'Byrne, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2020 filed by Pandora Media, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/18/20. (ntl) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2020 - filed by Pandora Media, LLC. (Moore, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Franklin D. Kang filed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/18/20. (ntl) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Franklin D. Kang - filed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. Pandora Media, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01024-UNA, 1:20-cv-01025-UNA, 1:20-cv-01026-UNA, 1:20-cv-01027-UNA, 1:20-cv-01028-UNA(nms) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,609,096. (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Pandora Media, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3098294.) - filed by Raindrops Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pandora Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong