This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2022 at 07:25:14 (UTC).

RailWorks Track Systems LLC v. Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 RailWorks Track Systems LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02834

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RailWorks Track Systems LLC

Defendant

Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd Michael Heffner

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

600 Peachtree St Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Wheaton Webb

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Attachment To Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by RailWorks Track Systems LLC. (ane) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority. (ane) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on July 21, 2022. (ash) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Webb, Wheaton) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Heffner, Todd) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Heffner, Todd) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Webb, Wheaton) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on July 21, 2022. (ash) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority. (ane) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by RailWorks Track Systems LLC. (ane) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by RailWorks Track Systems LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11936168) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment To Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority (MARTA) is a litigant

Latest cases where RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant