This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:07:00 (UTC).

Raila v The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Raila filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07580

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrea Raila

Andrea A. Raila

Defendants

Kimberly Foxx

David Orr

Jonathan Swain

Dorothy Brown

Christopher Agrella

Marisel Hernandez

The Chicago Board of Election Commissioners and its Members

The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members

William Kresse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Russell Smith

5514 N. Wayne Ave.

Chicago, IL 60640

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick Daniel Morris

Attorney at Cook County State's Attorney's Office

50 W. Washington Street, Suite 2760

Chicago, IL 60602

Joi Kamper

Attorney at Cook County State's Attorney

50 W Washington Suite 2760

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to 1/27/2020 to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. No appearance is required on 1/6/2020. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#8) Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Joi Kamper for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #7 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Defendants Christopher Agrella, Dorothy Brown, David Orr, Kimberly Foxx, Marisel Hernandez, William Kresse, Jonathan Swain, The Chicago Board of Election Commissioners and its Members, The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christopher Agrella, Dorothy Brown, David Orr, Kimberly Foxx, Marisel Hernandez, William Kresse, Jonathan Swain, The Chicago Board of Election Commissioners and its Members, The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members by Patrick Daniel Morris (Morris, Patrick) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christopher Agrella, Dorothy Brown, David Orr, Kimberly Foxx, Marisel Hernandez, William Kresse, Jonathan Swain, The Chicago Board of Election Commissioners and its Members, The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members by Joi Kamper (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Joint status report due by 1/22/2020. Status hearing set for 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/26/2019:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Steven) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Andrea Raila; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16447574.(Smith, Steven) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to 1/27/2020 to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. No appearance is required on 1/6/2020. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Joi Kamper for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #7 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Defendants Christopher Agrella, Dorothy Brown, David Orr, Kimberly Foxx, Marisel Hernandez, William Kresse, Jonathan Swain, The Chicago Board of Election Commissioners and its Members, The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christopher Agrella, Dorothy Brown, David Orr, Kimberly Foxx, Marisel Hernandez, William Kresse, Jonathan Swain, The Chicago Board of Election Commissioners and its Members, The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members by Patrick Daniel Morris (Morris, Patrick) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christopher Agrella, Dorothy Brown, David Orr, Kimberly Foxx, Marisel Hernandez, William Kresse, Jonathan Swain, The Chicago Board of Election Commissioners and its Members, The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members by Joi Kamper (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dorothy Brown, The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members (jp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Cook County Officers Electoral Board and its Members (ec, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant David Orr (txl, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Joint status report due by 1/22/2020. Status hearing set for 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/26/2019:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Steven) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Andrea Raila; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16447574.(Smith, Steven) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.