This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2021 at 07:11:32 (UTC).

RAIL FREIGHT FUEL SURCHARGE ANTITRUST LITIGATION (NO. II)- MDL NO. 2925

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 RAIL FREIGHT FUEL SURCHARGE ANTITRUST LITIGATION NO II - MDL NO 2925 was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00008

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY

NORTHERN INDIANA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY LLC

AK STEEL CORPORATION

KELLOGG COMPANY

ENTERGY LOUISIANA, LLC

ENTERGY ARKANSAS, LLC

EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC

MISSISSIPPI POWER COMPANY

UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY

ALABAMA POWER COMPANY

DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE

GEORGIA POWER COMPANY

AMEREN DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

NORTH STAR BLUESCOPE STEEL LLC

DYNO NOBEL, INC.

CF INDUSTRIES, INC.

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

In Re

RAIL FREIGHT FUEL SURCHARGE ANTITRUST LITIGATION (NO. II)- MDL NO. 2925

402 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alden Lewis Atkins

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037

Craig Philip Seebald

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037

John H. Leseur

Attorney at SLOVER & LOFTUS LLP

1224 Seventeenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Frank J. Pergolizzi

Attorney at SLOVER & LOFTUS LLP

1224 Seventeenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Peter A. Pfohl

Attorney at SLOVER & LOFTUS LLP

1224 Seventeenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

David C Smith

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037

Lindsey R. Vaala

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS, L.L.P.

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 500-West

Washington, DC 20037

Sandra Lee Brown

Attorney at THOMPSON HINE LLP

1919 M Street Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

David Andrew Wilson

Attorney at THOMPSON HINE LLP

1919 M Street, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

Joseph M Vanek

Attorney at Sperling & Slater,P.C.

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

David P. Germaine

Attorney at SPERLING & SLATER, P.C.

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

John M. Majoras

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Allyson M. Maltas

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

555 11Th Street N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Linda Sue Stein

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Martin J. Mackowski

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Luke P. van Houwelingen

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Kent Alan Gardiner

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Tara L. Reinhart

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Matthew Aaron Tabas

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Other Attorneys

Molly Bruder Fox

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

150 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#741

(#741) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia K. York on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (York, Julia) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

740 #1

Exhibit Schedule of Cases

740 #740

Main Document

#739

(#739) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Conroy on behalf of ARCONIC, INC., ATLANTIC GRANITE COMPANY, AXIALL CORP, AXIALL L L C, AZUSA ROCK LLC, BARDON, INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BIRD INCORPORATED, BRUNNER ISLAND, LLC, CALHOUN ASPHALT COMPANY INC, CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC., CALMAT CO, CAMPBELL COMPANY OF CANADA, CAMPBELL FOODSERVICE COMPANY, CAMPBELL SOUP SUPPLY COMPANY L.L.C., CANADA IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, CEMENT TRANSPORT, LTD, CERTAINTEED CANADA, INC., CERTAINTEED CEILINGS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED GYPSUM & CEILING MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM AND CEILINGS USA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM NC, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM WEST VIRGINIA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM, INC., CERTAINTEED LLC, CHEM-MARINE CORPORATION OF SOUTH CAROLINA, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES REFINING & MARKETING, LLC, COGNIS USA LLC, CONAGRA BRANDS, INC., CONEMAUGH FUELS, LLC, DEGS OF NARROWS, LLC, DMG EQUIPMENT COMPANY LLC, DOMINION ENERGY FUEL SERVICES, INC., DOMINION ENERGY SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY GENERATION SERVICES, INC., DUKE ENERGY INDIANA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY KENTUCKY, LLC, DUKE ENERGY OHIO, LLC, DUKE ENERGY PROGRESS, LLC, EAST DUBUQUE NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY, EQUILON ENTERPRISES LLC, ETC SUNOCO HOLDINGS LLC, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXONMOBIL GLOBAL SERVICES COMPANY, EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, FLORIDA ROCK INDUSTRIES, INC., FULTON CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, GEOCYCLE LLC, GRAIN CRAFT, INC., HARPER BROTHERS LLC, HOLCIM (US) INC., HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, INC., IMPERIAL OIL, IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, IPSCO KOPPEL TUBULARS, L.L.C., IPSCO TUBULARS (KY), LLC, IPSCO TUBULARS INC., J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY, JOSEPH CAMPBELL COMPANY, KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, KEYSTONE FUELS, LLC, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC, LAFARGE NORTH AMERICA, INC., LAFARGE PNW, INC., LATTIMORE MATERIALS CORP., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MAERSK INC., MAERSK LINE UK LIMITED, MARTINS CREEK, LLC, MCCARTNEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, MONTOUR, LLC, MOTIVA ENTERPRISES, LLC, NLMK PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, NLMK USA, INC, NOVA CHEMICALS (CANADA) LTD., NOVA CHEMICALS CORPORATION, NOVA CHEMICALS, INC., OLD WORLD INDUSTRIES, LLC, PCS NITROGEN, INC., PCS PHOSPHATE COMPANY, INC., PCS SALES (USA), INC., PENNZOIL-QUAKER STATE COMPANY, PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY, PROCAT TESTING LLC, PROGRESS FUELS, LLC, R C SMITH COMPANIES LLC, REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., SAINT-GOBAIN CERAMICS & PLASTICS, INC., SHARON COATING, LLC, SHELL CHEMICAL LP, SHELL CHEMICALS CANADA, SHELL OIL COMPANY, SHELL TRADING (US) COMPANY, SMURFIT-STONE CONTAINER CANADA INC, SOUTHEASTERN MILLS, INC., SUNOCO (R&M), LLC, SYSTECH ENVIRONMENTAL CORPORATION, TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC, TALEN ENERGY SUPPLY, LLC, TALEN GENERATION, LLC, TALEN MONTANA, LLC, TAMINCO CORPORATION, TMK NSG, LLC, TRIANGLE ROCK PRODUCTS LLC, U.S. BORAX INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., UPS GROUND FREIGHT, INC., VIRGINIA CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY, VULCAN AGGREGATES COMPANY LLC, VULCAN CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS LLC, VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY, WESTLAKE LONGVIEW CORP, WESTLAKE MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC, WESTLAKE PETROCHEMICALS L L C, WESTLAKE POLYMERS L L C, WESTLAKE STYRENE L L C, WESTLAKE VINYLS CO L P, WESTLAKE VINYLS INC, WESTROCK COATED BOARD, LLC, WESTROCK COMPANY, WESTROCK CONTAINER, LLC, WESTROCK CONVERTING, LLC, WESTROCK CP, LLC, WESTROCK KRAFT PAPER, LLC, WESTROCK LONGVIEW, LLC, WESTROCK MILL COMPANY, LLC, WESTROCK MINNESOTA CORPORATION, WESTROCK NORTHWEST, LLC, WESTROCK SOUTHEAST, LLC, WESTROCK TEXAS, L.P., WESTROCK VIRGINIA, LLC, WESTROCK-SOLVAY, LLC, WHITE SPRINGS AGRICULTURAL CHEMICALS, INC., WYNNEWOOD REFINING COMPANY, LLC, AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - MWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - SWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES MANAGEMENT, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES NORTHEAST REGION, INC., AGGREGATES USA (MACON) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SAVANNAH) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SPARTA) LLC, AGGREGATES USA, LLC, AGRIUM (U.S.), INC., ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., AMALGAMATED SUGAR COMPANY, LLC, AMERICAN ROCK SALT COMPANY LLC, AP MOLLER - MAERSK A/S (Conroy, Alexandria) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#738

(#738) NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Cobb on behalf of ARCONIC, INC., ATLANTIC GRANITE COMPANY, AXIALL CORP, AXIALL L L C, AZUSA ROCK LLC, BARDON, INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BIRD INCORPORATED, BRUNNER ISLAND, LLC, CALHOUN ASPHALT COMPANY INC, CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC., CALMAT CO, CAMPBELL COMPANY OF CANADA, CAMPBELL FOODSERVICE COMPANY, CAMPBELL SOUP SUPPLY COMPANY L.L.C., CANADA IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, CEMENT TRANSPORT, LTD, CERTAINTEED CANADA, INC., CERTAINTEED CEILINGS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED GYPSUM & CEILING MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM AND CEILINGS USA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM NC, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM WEST VIRGINIA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM, INC., CERTAINTEED LLC, CHEM-MARINE CORPORATION OF SOUTH CAROLINA, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES REFINING & MARKETING, LLC, COGNIS USA LLC, CONAGRA BRANDS, INC., CONEMAUGH FUELS, LLC, DEGS OF NARROWS, LLC, DMG EQUIPMENT COMPANY LLC, DOMINION ENERGY FUEL SERVICES, INC., DOMINION ENERGY SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY GENERATION SERVICES, INC., DUKE ENERGY INDIANA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY KENTUCKY, LLC, DUKE ENERGY OHIO, LLC, DUKE ENERGY PROGRESS, LLC, EAST DUBUQUE NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY, ETC SUNOCO HOLDINGS LLC, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXONMOBIL GLOBAL SERVICES COMPANY, EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, FLORIDA ROCK INDUSTRIES, INC., FULTON CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, GEOCYCLE LLC, GRAIN CRAFT, INC., HARPER BROTHERS LLC, HOLCIM (US) INC., HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, INC., IMPERIAL OIL, IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, IPSCO KOPPEL TUBULARS, L.L.C., IPSCO TUBULARS (KY), LLC, IPSCO TUBULARS INC., J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY, JOSEPH CAMPBELL COMPANY, KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, KEYSTONE FUELS, LLC, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC, LAFARGE NORTH AMERICA, INC., LAFARGE PNW, INC., LATTIMORE MATERIALS CORP., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MAERSK INC., MAERSK LINE UK LIMITED, MARTINS CREEK, LLC, MCCARTNEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, MONTOUR, LLC, MOTIVA ENTERPRISES, LLC, NLMK PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, NLMK USA, INC, NOVA CHEMICALS (CANADA) LTD., NOVA CHEMICALS CORPORATION, NOVA CHEMICALS, INC., OLD WORLD INDUSTRIES, LLC, PCS NITROGEN, INC., PCS PHOSPHATE COMPANY, INC., PCS SALES (USA), INC., PENNZOIL-QUAKER STATE COMPANY, PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY, PROCAT TESTING LLC, PROGRESS FUELS, LLC, R C SMITH COMPANIES LLC, REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., SAINT-GOBAIN CERAMICS & PLASTICS, INC., SHARON COATING, LLC, SHELL CHEMICAL LP, SHELL CHEMICALS CANADA, SHELL OIL COMPANY, SHELL TRADING (US) COMPANY, SMURFIT-STONE CONTAINER CANADA INC, SOLUTIA INC., SOUTHEASTERN MILLS, INC., SUNOCO (R&M), LLC, SYSTECH ENVIRONMENTAL CORPORATION, TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC, TALEN ENERGY SUPPLY, LLC, TALEN GENERATION, LLC, TALEN MONTANA, LLC, TAMINCO CORPORATION, TMK NSG, LLC, TRIANGLE ROCK PRODUCTS LLC, U.S. BORAX INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., UPS GROUND FREIGHT, INC., VIRGINIA CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY, VULCAN AGGREGATES COMPANY LLC, VULCAN CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS LLC, VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY, WESTLAKE LONGVIEW CORP, WESTLAKE MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC, WESTLAKE PETROCHEMICALS L L C, WESTLAKE POLYMERS L L C, WESTLAKE STYRENE L L C, WESTLAKE VINYLS CO L P, WESTLAKE VINYLS INC, WESTROCK COATED BOARD, LLC, WESTROCK COMPANY, WESTROCK CONTAINER, LLC, WESTROCK CONVERTING, LLC, WESTROCK CP, LLC, WESTROCK KRAFT PAPER, LLC, WESTROCK LONGVIEW, LLC, WESTROCK MILL COMPANY, LLC, WESTROCK MINNESOTA CORPORATION, WESTROCK NORTHWEST, LLC, WESTROCK SOUTHEAST, LLC, WESTROCK TEXAS, L.P., WESTROCK VIRGINIA, LLC, WESTROCK-SOLVAY, LLC, WHITE SPRINGS AGRICULTURAL CHEMICALS, INC., WYNNEWOOD REFINING COMPANY, LLC, AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - MWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - SWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES MANAGEMENT, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES NORTHEAST REGION, INC., AGGREGATES USA (MACON) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SAVANNAH) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SPARTA) LLC, AGGREGATES USA, LLC, AGRIUM (U.S.), INC., ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., AMALGAMATED SUGAR COMPANY, LLC, AMERICAN ROCK SALT COMPANY LLC, AP MOLLER - MAERSK A/S (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#737

(#737) NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Mahaney on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Mahaney, John) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#736

(#736) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ARKEMA INC., ARRMAZ PRODUCTS INC., BOISE CASCADE COMPANY, BOTTLING GROUP, LLC, COALSALES II, LLC, CONSOL ENERGY INC., CROWLEY LINER SERVICES, INC., CROWLEY LOGISTICS, INC., CROWLEY MARITIME CORPORATION, EQUISTAR CHEMICALS, LP, FRITO-LAY, INC., GRAND RIVER DAM AUTHORITY, J. R. SIMPLOT COMPANY, LANSING BOARD OF WATER AND LIGHT, LOTTE GLOBAL LOGISTICS (NORTH AMERICA), INC., LYONDELL CHEMICAL COMPANY, LYONDELLBASELL ACETYLS, LLC, LYONDELLBASELL ADVANCED POLYMERS INC., METAL MANAGEMENT INDIANA, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT MEMPHIS, LLC, METAL MANAGEMENT MIDWEST, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT NORTHEAST, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT OHIO, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT PITTSBURGH, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT, INC., MILLERCOORS, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, ROSEBURG FOREST PRODUCTS CO., SCHIABO LAROVO CORPORATION, SIMS GROUP USA CORPORATION, SIMS GROUP USA HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SIMS SOUTHWEST CORPORATION, SIMSMETAL EAST LLC, SIMSMETAL WEST LLC, SMM NEW ENGLAND CORPORATION, SMM SOUTH CORPORATION, SMM SOUTHEAST LLC, SUZUKI MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., TMS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC., TRAMMO, INC., TROPICANA PRODUCTS, INC., TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC, U.S. SILICA COMPANY. Attorney Matthew David Wood terminated. (Wood, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#735

(#735) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan L. Petkovich on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Petkovich, Morgan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#734

(#734) NOTICE of Appearance by William Stewart, Jr on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Stewart, William) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order

7 #1

Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Proposed Order by DOMTAR CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) dated 2/28/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2925)(ztnr) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY with Jury Demand filed by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TOYOTA CANADA INC..(Hassi, Edward) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) dated 2/21/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#3

(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) dated 2/19/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) dated 2/18/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER dated 2/6/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

977 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#741) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia K. York on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (York, Julia) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#740) NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Cases)(Maughan, Diane) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#739) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Conroy on behalf of ARCONIC, INC., ATLANTIC GRANITE COMPANY, AXIALL CORP, AXIALL L L C, AZUSA ROCK LLC, BARDON, INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BIRD INCORPORATED, BRUNNER ISLAND, LLC, CALHOUN ASPHALT COMPANY INC, CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC., CALMAT CO, CAMPBELL COMPANY OF CANADA, CAMPBELL FOODSERVICE COMPANY, CAMPBELL SOUP SUPPLY COMPANY L.L.C., CANADA IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, CEMENT TRANSPORT, LTD, CERTAINTEED CANADA, INC., CERTAINTEED CEILINGS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED GYPSUM & CEILING MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM AND CEILINGS USA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM NC, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM WEST VIRGINIA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM, INC., CERTAINTEED LLC, CHEM-MARINE CORPORATION OF SOUTH CAROLINA, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES REFINING & MARKETING, LLC, COGNIS USA LLC, CONAGRA BRANDS, INC., CONEMAUGH FUELS, LLC, DEGS OF NARROWS, LLC, DMG EQUIPMENT COMPANY LLC, DOMINION ENERGY FUEL SERVICES, INC., DOMINION ENERGY SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY GENERATION SERVICES, INC., DUKE ENERGY INDIANA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY KENTUCKY, LLC, DUKE ENERGY OHIO, LLC, DUKE ENERGY PROGRESS, LLC, EAST DUBUQUE NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY, EQUILON ENTERPRISES LLC, ETC SUNOCO HOLDINGS LLC, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXONMOBIL GLOBAL SERVICES COMPANY, EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, FLORIDA ROCK INDUSTRIES, INC., FULTON CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, GEOCYCLE LLC, GRAIN CRAFT, INC., HARPER BROTHERS LLC, HOLCIM (US) INC., HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, INC., IMPERIAL OIL, IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, IPSCO KOPPEL TUBULARS, L.L.C., IPSCO TUBULARS (KY), LLC, IPSCO TUBULARS INC., J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY, JOSEPH CAMPBELL COMPANY, KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, KEYSTONE FUELS, LLC, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC, LAFARGE NORTH AMERICA, INC., LAFARGE PNW, INC., LATTIMORE MATERIALS CORP., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MAERSK INC., MAERSK LINE UK LIMITED, MARTINS CREEK, LLC, MCCARTNEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, MONTOUR, LLC, MOTIVA ENTERPRISES, LLC, NLMK PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, NLMK USA, INC, NOVA CHEMICALS (CANADA) LTD., NOVA CHEMICALS CORPORATION, NOVA CHEMICALS, INC., OLD WORLD INDUSTRIES, LLC, PCS NITROGEN, INC., PCS PHOSPHATE COMPANY, INC., PCS SALES (USA), INC., PENNZOIL-QUAKER STATE COMPANY, PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY, PROCAT TESTING LLC, PROGRESS FUELS, LLC, R C SMITH COMPANIES LLC, REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., SAINT-GOBAIN CERAMICS & PLASTICS, INC., SHARON COATING, LLC, SHELL CHEMICAL LP, SHELL CHEMICALS CANADA, SHELL OIL COMPANY, SHELL TRADING (US) COMPANY, SMURFIT-STONE CONTAINER CANADA INC, SOUTHEASTERN MILLS, INC., SUNOCO (R&M), LLC, SYSTECH ENVIRONMENTAL CORPORATION, TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC, TALEN ENERGY SUPPLY, LLC, TALEN GENERATION, LLC, TALEN MONTANA, LLC, TAMINCO CORPORATION, TMK NSG, LLC, TRIANGLE ROCK PRODUCTS LLC, U.S. BORAX INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., UPS GROUND FREIGHT, INC., VIRGINIA CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY, VULCAN AGGREGATES COMPANY LLC, VULCAN CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS LLC, VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY, WESTLAKE LONGVIEW CORP, WESTLAKE MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC, WESTLAKE PETROCHEMICALS L L C, WESTLAKE POLYMERS L L C, WESTLAKE STYRENE L L C, WESTLAKE VINYLS CO L P, WESTLAKE VINYLS INC, WESTROCK COATED BOARD, LLC, WESTROCK COMPANY, WESTROCK CONTAINER, LLC, WESTROCK CONVERTING, LLC, WESTROCK CP, LLC, WESTROCK KRAFT PAPER, LLC, WESTROCK LONGVIEW, LLC, WESTROCK MILL COMPANY, LLC, WESTROCK MINNESOTA CORPORATION, WESTROCK NORTHWEST, LLC, WESTROCK SOUTHEAST, LLC, WESTROCK TEXAS, L.P., WESTROCK VIRGINIA, LLC, WESTROCK-SOLVAY, LLC, WHITE SPRINGS AGRICULTURAL CHEMICALS, INC., WYNNEWOOD REFINING COMPANY, LLC, AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - MWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - SWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES MANAGEMENT, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES NORTHEAST REGION, INC., AGGREGATES USA (MACON) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SAVANNAH) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SPARTA) LLC, AGGREGATES USA, LLC, AGRIUM (U.S.), INC., ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., AMALGAMATED SUGAR COMPANY, LLC, AMERICAN ROCK SALT COMPANY LLC, AP MOLLER - MAERSK A/S (Conroy, Alexandria) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#738) NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Cobb on behalf of ARCONIC, INC., ATLANTIC GRANITE COMPANY, AXIALL CORP, AXIALL L L C, AZUSA ROCK LLC, BARDON, INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BIRD INCORPORATED, BRUNNER ISLAND, LLC, CALHOUN ASPHALT COMPANY INC, CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC., CALMAT CO, CAMPBELL COMPANY OF CANADA, CAMPBELL FOODSERVICE COMPANY, CAMPBELL SOUP SUPPLY COMPANY L.L.C., CANADA IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, CEMENT TRANSPORT, LTD, CERTAINTEED CANADA, INC., CERTAINTEED CEILINGS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED GYPSUM & CEILING MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM AND CEILINGS USA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM MANUFACTURING, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM NC, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM WEST VIRGINIA, INC., CERTAINTEED GYPSUM, INC., CERTAINTEED LLC, CHEM-MARINE CORPORATION OF SOUTH CAROLINA, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, COFFEYVILLE RESOURCES REFINING & MARKETING, LLC, COGNIS USA LLC, CONAGRA BRANDS, INC., CONEMAUGH FUELS, LLC, DEGS OF NARROWS, LLC, DMG EQUIPMENT COMPANY LLC, DOMINION ENERGY FUEL SERVICES, INC., DOMINION ENERGY SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY GENERATION SERVICES, INC., DUKE ENERGY INDIANA, LLC, DUKE ENERGY KENTUCKY, LLC, DUKE ENERGY OHIO, LLC, DUKE ENERGY PROGRESS, LLC, EAST DUBUQUE NITROGEN FERTILIZERS, LLC, EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY, ETC SUNOCO HOLDINGS LLC, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXONMOBIL GLOBAL SERVICES COMPANY, EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, FLORIDA ROCK INDUSTRIES, INC., FULTON CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, GEOCYCLE LLC, GRAIN CRAFT, INC., HARPER BROTHERS LLC, HOLCIM (US) INC., HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, INC., IMPERIAL OIL, IMPERIAL OIL LIMITED, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, IPSCO KOPPEL TUBULARS, L.L.C., IPSCO TUBULARS (KY), LLC, IPSCO TUBULARS INC., J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY, JOSEPH CAMPBELL COMPANY, KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, KEYSTONE FUELS, LLC, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC, LAFARGE NORTH AMERICA, INC., LAFARGE PNW, INC., LATTIMORE MATERIALS CORP., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MAERSK INC., MAERSK LINE UK LIMITED, MARTINS CREEK, LLC, MCCARTNEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, MONTOUR, LLC, MOTIVA ENTERPRISES, LLC, NLMK PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, NLMK USA, INC, NOVA CHEMICALS (CANADA) LTD., NOVA CHEMICALS CORPORATION, NOVA CHEMICALS, INC., OLD WORLD INDUSTRIES, LLC, PCS NITROGEN, INC., PCS PHOSPHATE COMPANY, INC., PCS SALES (USA), INC., PENNZOIL-QUAKER STATE COMPANY, PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY, PROCAT TESTING LLC, PROGRESS FUELS, LLC, R C SMITH COMPANIES LLC, REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., SAINT-GOBAIN CERAMICS & PLASTICS, INC., SHARON COATING, LLC, SHELL CHEMICAL LP, SHELL CHEMICALS CANADA, SHELL OIL COMPANY, SHELL TRADING (US) COMPANY, SMURFIT-STONE CONTAINER CANADA INC, SOLUTIA INC., SOUTHEASTERN MILLS, INC., SUNOCO (R&M), LLC, SYSTECH ENVIRONMENTAL CORPORATION, TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC, TALEN ENERGY SUPPLY, LLC, TALEN GENERATION, LLC, TALEN MONTANA, LLC, TAMINCO CORPORATION, TMK NSG, LLC, TRIANGLE ROCK PRODUCTS LLC, U.S. BORAX INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., UPS GROUND FREIGHT, INC., VIRGINIA CONCRETE COMPANY LLC, VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY, VULCAN AGGREGATES COMPANY LLC, VULCAN CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS LLC, VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY, WESTLAKE LONGVIEW CORP, WESTLAKE MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC, WESTLAKE PETROCHEMICALS L L C, WESTLAKE POLYMERS L L C, WESTLAKE STYRENE L L C, WESTLAKE VINYLS CO L P, WESTLAKE VINYLS INC, WESTROCK COATED BOARD, LLC, WESTROCK COMPANY, WESTROCK CONTAINER, LLC, WESTROCK CONVERTING, LLC, WESTROCK CP, LLC, WESTROCK KRAFT PAPER, LLC, WESTROCK LONGVIEW, LLC, WESTROCK MILL COMPANY, LLC, WESTROCK MINNESOTA CORPORATION, WESTROCK NORTHWEST, LLC, WESTROCK SOUTHEAST, LLC, WESTROCK TEXAS, L.P., WESTROCK VIRGINIA, LLC, WESTROCK-SOLVAY, LLC, WHITE SPRINGS AGRICULTURAL CHEMICALS, INC., WYNNEWOOD REFINING COMPANY, LLC, AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - MWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES - SWR, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES MANAGEMENT, INC., AGGREGATE INDUSTRIES NORTHEAST REGION, INC., AGGREGATES USA (MACON) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SAVANNAH) LLC, AGGREGATES USA (SPARTA) LLC, AGGREGATES USA, LLC, AGRIUM (U.S.), INC., ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., AMALGAMATED SUGAR COMPANY, LLC, AMERICAN ROCK SALT COMPANY LLC, AP MOLLER - MAERSK A/S (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#737) NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Mahaney on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Mahaney, John) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#736) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ARKEMA INC., ARRMAZ PRODUCTS INC., BOISE CASCADE COMPANY, BOTTLING GROUP, LLC, COALSALES II, LLC, CONSOL ENERGY INC., CROWLEY LINER SERVICES, INC., CROWLEY LOGISTICS, INC., CROWLEY MARITIME CORPORATION, EQUISTAR CHEMICALS, LP, FRITO-LAY, INC., GRAND RIVER DAM AUTHORITY, J. R. SIMPLOT COMPANY, LANSING BOARD OF WATER AND LIGHT, LOTTE GLOBAL LOGISTICS (NORTH AMERICA), INC., LYONDELL CHEMICAL COMPANY, LYONDELLBASELL ACETYLS, LLC, LYONDELLBASELL ADVANCED POLYMERS INC., METAL MANAGEMENT INDIANA, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT MEMPHIS, LLC, METAL MANAGEMENT MIDWEST, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT NORTHEAST, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT OHIO, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT PITTSBURGH, INC., METAL MANAGEMENT, INC., MILLERCOORS, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, ROSEBURG FOREST PRODUCTS CO., SCHIABO LAROVO CORPORATION, SIMS GROUP USA CORPORATION, SIMS GROUP USA HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SIMS SOUTHWEST CORPORATION, SIMSMETAL EAST LLC, SIMSMETAL WEST LLC, SMM NEW ENGLAND CORPORATION, SMM SOUTH CORPORATION, SMM SOUTHEAST LLC, SUZUKI MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., TMS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC., TRAMMO, INC., TROPICANA PRODUCTS, INC., TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC, U.S. SILICA COMPANY. Attorney Matthew David Wood terminated. (Wood, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#735) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan L. Petkovich on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Petkovich, Morgan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#734) NOTICE of Appearance by William Stewart, Jr on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Stewart, William) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#733) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Enson on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Enson, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#732) Joint STATUS REPORT by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, MISSISSIPPI POWER COMPANY, NORTHERN INDIANA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY LLC, UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, AMEREN DEVELOPMENT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Joint Status Report)(Brown, Sandra) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
815 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 10, 2020. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2925 Cases) (lcbah3) Modified to correct typo on 3/11/2020 (tg). (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Proposed Order by SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Proposed Order by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Proposed Order by DOMTAR CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) dated 2/28/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2925)(ztnr) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY with Jury Demand filed by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TOYOTA CANADA INC..(Hassi, Edward) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) dated 2/21/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) dated 2/19/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) dated 2/18/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER dated 2/6/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2925) (ztnr) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH STAR BLUESCOPE STEEL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHERN INDIANA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEORGIA POWER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CF INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant