This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2023 at 08:11:05 (UTC).

Rail Assets, LLC v. Norfolk Southern Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Rail Assets, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Norfolk Southern Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Geraghty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04431

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Geraghty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rail Assets, LLC

Defendant

Norfolk Southern Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacqueline Knapp Burt

Attorney at Insight, PLC

860 Johnson Ferry Rd. Ne, Ste #140-176

Atlanta, GA 30342

Steven W. Ritcheson

Attorney at Insight, PLC-CA

578 Washington Blvd., Suite 503

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Huynh

Attorney at Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP

3343 Peachtree Road Ne, 1600 Atlanta Financial Center

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rail Assets, LLC.(lwb) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corp. (lwb) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#4

(#4) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (lwb) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 11/18/2022. (sap) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend Defend

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Norfolk Southern Corp. shall have through 1/17/2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 11/23/2022. (ane) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#8

(#8) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven W. Ritcheson. Clerk to follow-up by 12/8/2022. (pdt) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to of Steven Whitefield Ritcheson re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (ane) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven Whitefield Ritcheson. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 12/21/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Whitefield Ritcheson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12264881). Attorney Steven W. Ritcheson added appearing on behalf of Rail Assets, LLC (cdg) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Whitefield Ritcheson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12264881).by Rail Assets, LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven W. Ritcheson. Clerk to follow-up by 12/8/2022. (pdt) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Norfolk Southern Corp. shall have through 1/17/2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 11/23/2022. (ane) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Norfolk Southern Corp. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Huynh, Daniel) Modified text on 11/23/2022 (ane). (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 11/18/2022. (sap) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (lwb) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corp. (lwb) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rail Assets, LLC.(lwb) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rail Assets, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12181191) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL HUYNH