This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 08:21:22 (UTC).

RAIKOS-EVORA v. RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 RAIKOS-EVORA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John Michael Vazquez and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-20048

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARGARITA RAIKOS-EVORA

Defendants

RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.

JOHN DOE 1 THROUGH X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN C. CORRISTON

Attorney at BRESLIN AND BRESLIN

41 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorney

Ana Parikh

Attorney at RIVKIN RADLER, LLP

25 Main Street, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Parikh, Ana) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference set for 2/22/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/15/2021. (spc) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference set for 2/22/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/15/2021. (spc) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification on behalf of RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parikh, Ana) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketJudge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Parikh, Ana) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-2428-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12987318), filed by RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parikh, Ana) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anish Parikh