This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2020 at 18:38:47 (UTC).

RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc. et al v. Altria Client Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Altria Client Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00393

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.

R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company

Defendants

Philip Morris International Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Philip Morris Products S.A.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Michael Maiorana

Attorney at Jones Day (OH)

901 Lakeside Ave

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant Attorney

Maximilian Antony Grant

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC)

555 11Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

1 #7

Exhibit F-US10492542

1 #6

Exhibit E-US9930915

1 #5

Exhibit D-US9901123

1 #4

Exhibit C-US9839238

1 #3

Exhibit B-US9814268

1 #2

Exhibit A-US8314591

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) So Ordered re #15 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants Altria Group, Inc. (AGI) and Philip Morris International Inc. (PMII), filed by Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris International Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Philip Morris Products S.A., Altria Client Services LLC. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/5/2020. (dvanm, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 5/5/2020) (dzir, ). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER - Finding good cause to do so, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion and extends the deadline for Defendants to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint up to and including June 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 5/4/2020. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris International Inc., Philip Morris Products S.A., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Maximilian) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Altria Group, Inc. and Philip Morris International Inc. by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris International Inc., Philip Morris Products S.A., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Grant, Maximilian) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company as to Philip Morris Products S.A.. (Maiorana, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. Philip Morris Products S.A. waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Maiorana, David) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Philip Morris USA, Inc. on 04/13/2020, filed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Philip Morris International Inc. on 04/13/2020, filed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Altria Group, Inc. on 04/13/2020, filed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Altria Client Services LLC on 04/13/2020, filed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris International Inc., Philip Morris Products S.A., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/9/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Philip Morris USA, Inc. by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/9/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Philip Morris Products, S.A. by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/9/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Philip Morris International Inc. by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/9/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Altria Group, Inc. by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/9/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Altria Client Services LLC by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc.. (Maiorana, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/9/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7152810.), filed by RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-US8314591, #3 Exhibit B-US9814268, #4 Exhibit C-US9839238, #5 Exhibit D-US9901123, #6 Exhibit E-US9930915, #7 Exhibit F-US10492542)(Maiorana, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/9/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAI STRATEGIC HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris Products S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris USA, Inc. is a litigant