This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 08:39:48 (UTC).

Ramtin Rahmanian v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 Ramtin Rahmanian filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09721

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramtin Rahmanian

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

DOES 1 to 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashkan Ashour

Attorney at AAA - Law

18425 Burbank Boulevard Suite 715

Tarzana, CA 91356

Defendant Attorneys

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Answer

1 #3

Exhibit Sales contract

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Chinery, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-32490822 for $402 filing fee. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/14/2021, attached as Exhibit 2.(jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Ramtin Rahmanian filed in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/26/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Chinery, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE Notice of Removal filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Sales contract)(Chinery, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman