This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2021 at 07:04:02 (UTC).

Rahman v. Pacific Gas and Electric Co. et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Rahman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pacific Gas and Electric Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-09315

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammed Rahman

Defendants

Mouseflow, Inc.

Pacific Gas and Electric Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A. Bursor

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1420

Miami, FL 33131

L. Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Joel Dashiell Smith

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

Anahit Tagvoryan

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Julianna Simon

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Harrison Maxwell Brown

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Serli Polatoglu

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Katherine Frenck Murray

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Dennis S. Ellis

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mouseflow, Inc... (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna Simon FOR DEFENDANT, MOUSEFLOW INC. (Simon, Julianna) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Maxwell Brown FOR DEFENDANT, MOUSEFLOW INC. (Brown, Harrison) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#23

(#23) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Mouseflow, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/24/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#22

(#22) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pacific Gas and Electric Co... (Ellis, Dennis) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mouseflow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mouseflow ApS for Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#20

(#20) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mouseflow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mouseflow ApS for Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME FOR MOUSEFLOW INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NO MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 6-1) filed by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Anahit Tagvoryan (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Frenck Murray (Murray, Katherine) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis S. Ellis (Ellis, Dennis) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mohammed Rahman.. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Mouseflow, Inc., Pacific Gas and Electric Co. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#19) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME FOR MOUSEFLOW INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NO MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 6-1) filed by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mouseflow, Inc... (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna Simon FOR DEFENDANT, MOUSEFLOW INC. (Simon, Julianna) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Maxwell Brown FOR DEFENDANT, MOUSEFLOW INC. (Brown, Harrison) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Mouseflow, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/24/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pacific Gas and Electric Co... (Ellis, Dennis) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mouseflow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mouseflow ApS for Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mouseflow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mouseflow ApS for Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME FOR MOUSEFLOW INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NO MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 6-1) filed by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Anahit Tagvoryan (Tagvoryan, Anahit) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Rahman. Mouseflow, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Frenck Murray (Murray, Katherine) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis S. Ellis (Ellis, Dennis) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court p roceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAF F) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mohammed Rahman.. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Mouseflow, Inc., Pacific Gas and Electric Co. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mouseflow, Inc., Pacific Gas and Electric Co. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15360609.). Filed byMohammed Rahman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mouseflow, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Bursor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Timothy Fisher