This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 07:32:33 (UTC).

Ibrahim Rahman v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Ibrahim Rahman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02328

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ibrahim Rahman

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Michael Lovasz

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Jeeho Henberwithz Lim

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Defendant Attorneys

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 11/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Ibrahim Rahman, upon Defendant BMW of North America, LLC served on 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 1) (esa) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ibrahim Rahman. (filed in state court 9/4/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 8) (esa) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number RIC2003544 Receipt No: ACACDC-28897225 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Attorney Kate S Lehrman added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman