This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 06:44:49 (UTC).

Ragusa v. Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Ragusa filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown, Karen Wells Roby, Michael North and Carl Barbier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01971

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Carl Barbier

Referral Judges

Karen Wells Roby

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank P Ragusa, Jr

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Eagle, Inc.

Albert L. Bossier, Jr.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Foster Wheeler LLC

General Electric Company

Hopeman Brothers Inc

The McCarty Corporation

Taylor-Seidenbach Incorporated

CBS Corporation

Uniroyal Inc

International Paper Company

Shell Oil Company

Dow Chemical Company

ExxonMobil Corporation

Wyeth Holdings, LLC

Zeneca Inc

BP Products North America

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Albert L. Bossier, Jr.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Foster Wheeler LLC

General Electric Company

The McCarty Corporation

CBS Corporation

Uniroyal Inc

International Paper Company

Shell Oil Company

Dow Chemical Company

Wyeth Holdings, LLC

Zeneca Inc

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant

Albert L. Bossier, Jr.

75 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Peter Dinehart

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Gerolyn Petit Roussel

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Jonathan Brett Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Lauren Roussel Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Defendant, Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1555 Poydras St., Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Caroline M. Murley

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Gina Talluto Cursain

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lindsay C. Rabalais

Attorney at Law Offices of Dan Claitor

7520 Perkins Rd. #170

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Brian C. Bossier

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christopher Thomas Grace, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Whitney Charmaine Stewart

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP

3421 N Causeway Blvd, Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Susan Beth Kohn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alison A. Spindler

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian C. Bossier

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christopher Thomas Grace, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Whitney Charmaine Stewart

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP

3421 N Causeway Blvd, Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1555 Poydras St., Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Caroline M. Murley

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Gina Talluto Cursain

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lindsay C. Rabalais

Attorney at Law Offices of Dan Claitor

7520 Perkins Rd. #170

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

109 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#156

(#156) ANSWER to #132 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Syngenta Crop Protection LLC.(Shofstahl, Tyson) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#155

(#155) ANSWER to #132 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Grove U.S. LLC.(Shofstahl, Tyson) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

154 #1

Proposed Order

154 #154

Main Document

#153

(#153) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Third Supplemental & Amending by Riley Power, Inc..(Elliott, Douglas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#152

(#152) Summons Issued as to Rubicon LLC. (cg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

151 #1

Summons to Ruicon, LLC

151 #151

Main Document

#132

(#147) ANSWER to #132 Frank P. Ragusa, Jr.'s Third Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Marathon Petroleum Company LP.(Burr, Shannon) Modified link and text on 6/10/2022 (cg). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 First Supplemental Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal Inc.Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:crd), Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:dft).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 10/28/2021 (ecm). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Inc (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on October 27, 2021.(mp) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#6) ANSWER to #1 First Supplemental Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

278 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) ANSWER to #132 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Syngenta Crop Protection LLC.(Shofstahl, Tyson) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) ANSWER to #132 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Grove U.S. LLC.(Shofstahl, Tyson) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #132 Amended Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Third Supplemental & Amending by Riley Power, Inc..(Elliott, Douglas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) Summons Issued as to Rubicon LLC. (cg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) ANSWER to #132 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated against Rubicon LLC by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Ruicon, LLC)(Gillen, Laura) Modified Text on 6/10/2022 (cg). (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) ANSWER to #132 Amended Complaint by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) ANSWER to #132 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 6/10/2022 (cg). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) ANSWER to #132 Frank P. Ragusa, Jr.'s Third Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Marathon Petroleum Company LP.(Burr, Shannon) Modified link and text on 6/10/2022 (cg). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/28/2021.(jeg)(NEF: Magistrates 1 and 4) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Frank P Ragusa, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Clement, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Frank P Ragusa, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13)(Clement, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo recused. Case reassigned to Judge Carl Barbier. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/28/2021.(am) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 First Supplemental Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 First Supplemental Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal Inc.Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:crd), Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:dft).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 10/28/2021 (ecm). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Inc (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on October 27, 2021.(mp) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2021-6076 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9080635) filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:crc), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:3pp), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENECA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Eagle Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant