This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 10:19:49 (UTC).

Radix Law PLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Radix Law PLC filed an Other lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01810

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Radix Law PLC

Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan B Frutkin

Attorney at Radix Law PLC

15205 N Kierland Blvd., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

Robert Neil Mann

Attorney at Radix Law PLC

15205 N Kierland Blvd., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Adrianna Griego Gorton

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Radix Law PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radix Law PLC. (Frutkin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#7

(#7) *Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Company for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Goodwin, Nicole) *Modified corporate party per party name standards on 10/26/2020 (REK). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#6

(#6) *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Goodwin, Nicole) *Modified to correct motion type on 10/26/2020 (REK). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, and Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 23, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/22/20. (MAW) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodwin, Nicole) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Radix Law PLC. (REK) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18674343. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01810-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #5

Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-054885. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18674343 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (submitted by Nicole Goodwin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation to extend time is granted (Doc. #10 ), and Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than November 16, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/9/20. (MAW) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Radix Law PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 at 11:15AM before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Counsel are directed to call (866) 390-1828; Access code: 9667260. Counsel are advised that speaker phones are not permitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radix Law PLC. (Frutkin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Company for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Goodwin, Nicole) *Modified corporate party per party name standards on 10/26/2020 (REK). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Goodwin, Nicole) *Modified to correct motion type on 10/26/2020 (REK). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, and Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 23, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/22/20. (MAW) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodwin, Nicole) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Radix Law PLC. (REK) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18674343. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01810-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-054885. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18674343 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (submitted by Nicole Goodwin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less