This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2019 at 07:03:51 (UTC).

Radi et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Radi filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois Bloom and Frederic Block. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02769

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yamira Collazo

Curline Registe

David Radi

Defendants

ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp

Hyundai Motor America

Toyota Motor Corporation

Kia Motors America, Inc.

FCA US LLC

Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Rocco Farnolo

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik, LLP

360 Lexington Avenue, 11Th. Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

John Paul Del Monaco

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

John H. Beisner

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Lance Etcheverry

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Caroline Williams Van Ness

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Matthew Tako

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

300 S. Grand Ave., Ste 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Simon Coons

Attorney at Ansa Assuncao, LLP

707 Westchester Avenue, Suite 309

White Plains, NY 10604

John Michael Lyons

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market Street, Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#38

32 #3

Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

32 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

32 #1

Declaration of Matthew Tako

#32

31 #3

Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

31 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

31 #1

Declaration of Caroline Van Ness

#31

#3

#2

1 #6

Proposed Summons ZF TRW

1 #5

Proposed Summons Toyota Motors

1 #4

Proposed Summons Kia Motors

1 #3

Proposed Summons Hyundai Motors

1 #2

Proposed Summons FCA USA LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE: The #32 motion of Matthew Tako for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned action is granted. The admitted attorney, Matthew Tako, is permitted to appear as counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. in the above-captioned action. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/26/2019. (The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE: The #31 motion of Caroline Van Ness for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned action is granted. The admitted attorney, Caroline Van Ness, is permitted to appear as counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. in the above-captioned action. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/26/2019. (The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE: The #30 motion of John H. Beisner for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned action is granted. The admitted attorney, John H. Beisner, is permitted to appear as counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. in the above-captioned action. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/26/2019. (The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) STIPULATION AND ORDER for an Extension of Time for FCA US LLC to Respond to Complaint Pending MDL Motion, endorsed on doc.#29 . It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and FCA US, that FCA US's time to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be continued until after the JPML enters an order on consolidation. In the event that the JPML denies consolidation or the proceedings before it are otherwise terminated. FCA US shall answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint within 45 days after the denial/termination. Plaintiffs shall have 45 days after such filing to respond to any motion(s) that may be made by FCA US; FCA US shall have 30 days after Plaintiffs' response to file any reply. In the event that the JPML grants consolidation, FCA US's time to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint, and the time for any briefing on related motions, shall be determined by the Transferee Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/26/2019. (See document for details.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order dated June 18, 2019 granting Toyota Motor Sales, Inc.'s request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint served on Attorneys for Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, Toyota Motor Corp., Hyundai Motors America, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., FCA US LLC on June 21, 2019, filed by Yamira Collazo, David Radi, Curline Registe. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) AFFIDAVIT of Service for May 21, 2019 Order granting ZF TRW's extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint served on Attorneys for Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, Toyota Motor Corp., Hyundai Motors America, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., FCA US LLC on June 21, 2019, filed by Yamira Collazo, David Radi, Curline Registe. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Tako Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11609213. by Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Tako, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Tako, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Van Ness Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11609212. by Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caroline Van Ness, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Van Ness, Caroline) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John H. Beisner Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11609209. by Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Beisner, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Beisner, John) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Stipulation for Extension of Time for FCA US LLC to Respond to Complaint Pending MDL Motion by FCA US LLC. (Coons, James) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Copy of Motion of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchett, Jacqueline Santos- Silv A, Amanda Sw Anson, Gary E. Samo Uris and Nida Edith Samson for Centralization of Related Actions in the Central District of California, or in the Alternative, the Eastern District of Michigan, Pursuant to 28 U.s.c. 1407. Originally Filed Before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. ("ZF TRW") requests an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. ZF TRW shall respond to plaintiffs' complaint by 7/1/2019. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on all remaining defendants and file proof of service forthwith. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 5/21/2019. (ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.'s answer due 5/21/2019.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp identifying Corporate Parent ZF North America, Inc., Corporate Parent ZF Holdings B.V., Corporate Parent ZF Friedrichshafen AG for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Del Monaco, John) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Del Monaco, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Del Monaco on behalf of ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp (aty to be noticed) (Del Monaco, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11468872 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yamira Collazo, Curline Registe, David Radi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons FCA USA LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Hyundai Motors, #4 Proposed Summons Kia Motors, #5 Proposed Summons Toyota Motors, #6 Proposed Summons ZF TRW) (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less