This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 09:03:03 (UTC).

Radek et al v. Varsity Brands, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Radek filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Varsity Brands, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Annie T. Christoff. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02649

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lauren Hayes

Janine Cherasaro

Kathryn Anne Radek

Defendants

U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.

Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC

Varsity Brands, LLC

Varsity Spirit, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank B. Thacher, III

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Karin E Garvey

Attorney at LABATON SUCHAROW, LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Ethan H Kaminsky

Attorney at LABATON SUCHAROW, LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Gregory S. Asciolla

Attorney at LABATON SUCHAROW LLP

140 Boadway

New York, NY 10005-1108

Veronica Bosco

Attorney at LABATON SUCHAROW, LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Adam S. Baldridge

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ-Memphis

165 Madison Ave, Ste 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Matthew Sinon Mulqueen

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC-Memphis

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

34 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#34

(#34) Certificate of Good Standing by Kathryn Anne Radek. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barrett, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#32

(#32) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 42 AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/18/20. (shl) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#28

(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Bosco, Veronica) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Kaminsky, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#26

(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Garvey, Karin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

7 #3

summons

7 #1

summons

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(jae) (Summons replaced to show correct presiding judge) (jae). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T Christoff added. (jae) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/26/2020) (jae). Modified on 8/26/2020 (jae). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#55

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek Regarding Lead Counsel Designation (Thacher, Frank) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3421419), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Thacher, Frank) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#35) SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set for Friday, November 18, 2022 at 9:30 AM via Skype Video before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-02600-SHL-cgc, 2:20-cv-02649-SHL-atc(smm)** Modified on 10/23/2020 to correct the date. **(smm). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Certificate of Good Standing by Kathryn Anne Radek. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barrett, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/30/20 before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Court Reporter Candace Covey, Telephone number 901-495-1216. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 10/7/2020. Redaction Request due 10/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-02600-SHL-cgc, 2:20-cv-02649-SHL-atc(Covey, Candace) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 42 AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/18/20. (shl) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/18/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/18/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/18/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Bosco, Veronica) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Kaminsky, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Garvey, Karin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karin E. Garvey (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3423951) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Garvey, Karin) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory S. Asciolla (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3423915) filed by Janine Cherasaro, Kathryn Anne Radek, Lauren Hayes has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Local Rules require two certificate of good standing. Filer submitted only one from a Supreme Court, but failed to include one from a US District Court. Motion will be termed pending corrected filing. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory S. Asciolla (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3423915) by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek. (Asciolla, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(jae) (Summons replaced to show correct presiding judge) (jae). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T Christoff added. (jae) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/26/2020) (jae). Modified on 8/26/2020 (jae). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Janine Cherasaro, Lauren Hayes, Kathryn Anne Radek Regarding Lead Counsel Designation (Thacher, Frank) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3421419), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Thacher, Frank) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. All Star Federation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, LLC is a litigant