This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 08:41:02 (UTC).

Radcliffe v. CR Laurence Co Inc

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 Radcliffe filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CR Laurence Co Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Theresa L Fricke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Fricke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Radcliffe

Defendant

CR Laurence Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Victoria Masters

Attorney at EMERY REDDY

600 Stewart St, Ste 1100

Seattle, WA 98101

Patrick B. Reddy

Attorney at EMERY REDDY

600 Stewart St, Ste 1100

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Goldie A Davidoff

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON (WA)

One Union Square, 600 University St

Seattle, WA 98101-3122

Thomas Patrick Holt

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON (WA)

One Union Square, 600 University St

Seattle, WA 98101-3122

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Scheduling Order. (Service of corrected image is attached). (TW) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Theresa L Fricke: Jury Trial is set for 8/15/2022 before Judge Theresa L Fricke. Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/15/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/22/2021, Motions related to discovery noted 4/11/2022, Discovery completed by 4/18/2022, Dispositive motions due by 5/20/2022, Motions in Limine due by 7/5/2022, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2022, Trial briefs/trial exhibits/jury instructions to be submitted by 8/8/2022.(DK) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/14/2021) (TW). Modified on 9/14/2021 (TW). (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#11

(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5 court days. Filed by Defendant CR Laurence Co Inc.(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/30/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2021, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint; by CR Laurence Co Inc.(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/30/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#5

(#5) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent CRH North America Limited, Corporate Parent CRH plc, Corporate Parent CRH Americas, Inc., Corporate Parent CRH Americas Products, Inc., Corporate Parent Oldcastle BuildingEnvelope, Inc., Corporate Parent Oldcastle Finance Inc., Corporate Parent Oldcastle Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent CRH Belgard Limited, Corporate Parent CRH International for CR Laurence Co Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CR Laurence Co Inc (Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Brandon Radcliffe (Reddy, Patrick) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Thomas P. Holt In Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal by Defendant CR Laurence Co Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number Case number not yet assigned; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7173529) Attorney Thomas Patrick Holt added to party C. R. Laurence Co., Inc.(pty:dft), filed by C. R. Laurence Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1)(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Scheduling Order. (Service of corrected image is attached). (TW) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Theresa L Fricke: Jury Trial is set for 8/15/2022 before Judge Theresa L Fricke. Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/15/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/22/2021, Motions related to discovery noted 4/11/2022, Discovery completed by 4/18/2022, Dispositive motions due by 5/20/2022, Motions in Limine due by 7/5/2022, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2022, Trial briefs/trial exhibits/jury instructions to be submitted by 8/8/2022.(DK) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/14/2021) (TW). Modified on 9/14/2021 (TW). (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5 court days. Filed by Defendant CR Laurence Co Inc.(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Report Deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/20/2021, (TW) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/30/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2021, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT by all parties to proceed before Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke. No declinations received. (TW) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint; by CR Laurence Co Inc.(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/30/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketJudge Theresa L Fricke added. (RE) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent CRH North America Limited, Corporate Parent CRH plc, Corporate Parent CRH Americas, Inc., Corporate Parent CRH Americas Products, Inc., Corporate Parent Oldcastle BuildingEnvelope, Inc., Corporate Parent Oldcastle Finance Inc., Corporate Parent Oldcastle Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent CRH Belgard Limited, Corporate Parent CRH International for CR Laurence Co Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CR Laurence Co Inc (Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Brandon Radcliffe (Reddy, Patrick) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Thomas P. Holt In Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal by Defendant CR Laurence Co Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number Case number not yet assigned; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7173529) Attorney Thomas Patrick Holt added to party C. R. Laurence Co., Inc.(pty:dft), filed by C. R. Laurence Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1)(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.R. Laurence Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Patrick Holt