This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2020 at 09:32:24 (UTC).

Racioppi v. Baker et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Racioppi filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marianne B. Bowler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11357

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marianne B. Bowler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samson Racioppi

Salisbury, MA 01952

Defendants

Governor Charlie Baker

Commissioner William Evans

Marty Walsh

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Consent Package (Form for Consent Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and instructions for the Form). (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Instructions for Service by USMS and Local Rule 4.1 (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering that summonses issue. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Samson Racioppi.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent Package (Form for Consent Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and instructions for the Form). (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Instructions for Service by USMS and Local Rule 4.1 (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering that summonses issue. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samson Racioppi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Samson Racioppi.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Charlie Baker is a litigant