This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 08:01:48 (UTC).

Racine Car Dealer, LLC v. Hyundai Motor America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Racine Car Dealer, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Racine Car Dealer, LLC

Defendants

Hyundai Motor America Corporation

Genesis Motor America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory E. Knoke

Attorney at Knoke & Ingebritsen Law Offices

1904 10Th Street, Po Box 620

Monroe, WI 53566

Peter J. Kind

Attorney at Knoke & Kind Law Office

1904 10Th Street

Monroe, WI 53566

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Genesis Motor America, LLC and Hyundai Motor America Corporation. (lak) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Genesis Motor America, LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation. (Kind, Peter) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Racine Car Dealer, LLC. (Kind, Peter) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Racine Car Dealer, LLC. (Kind, Peter) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Genesis Motor America, LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation. (Kind, Peter) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Genesis Motor America, LLC and Hyundai Motor America Corporation. (lak) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3078757.), filed by Racine Car Dealer, LLC, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kind, Peter) Modified on 6/21/2022. (lak) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENESIS MOTOR AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant