This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2020 at 07:39:51 (UTC).

Rachel Stull v. Allergan Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Rachel Stull filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott, David O. Carter, John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Karen E. Scott

John D. Early

Presiding Judges

David O. Carter

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rachel Stull

Defendants

Allergan PLC

Allergan Inc.

Allergan USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer A Lenze

Attorney at Lenze Lawyers PLC

1300 Highland Avenue Suite 207

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Lila Razmara

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Amanda Deanne McGee

Attorney at Lenze Lawyers PLC

1300 Highland Avenue Suite 207

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Kevin Frank Calcagnie

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Mark P Robinson, Jr

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02321; 8:19-cv-02322; 8:19-cv-02323; 8:19-cv-02324 (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, upon Defendant Allergan PLC served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dani Walker, Legal Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Cases, Notice to Parties of Court Directed ADR Program, Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03, Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, identifying Plaintiff Rachel Stull; Defendant Allergan Inc. f/k/a Inamed Corporation f/k/a McGhan Medical Corporation; Defendant Allergan PLC; Defendant Allergan USA, Inc.; Attorneys for Plaintiff Robinson Calcagnie, Inc. and Lenze Lawyers PLC. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, upon Defendant Allergan USA, Inc. served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Cases, Notice to Parties of Court Directed ADR Program, Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03, Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25104798 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. (Attorney Mark P Robinson, Jr added to party Rachel Stull(pty:pla))(Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, upon Defendant Allergan Inc. served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Cases, Notice to Parties of Court Directed ADR Program, Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03, Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02064 JLS(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00058 JLS(JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, upon Defendant Allergan PLC served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dani Walker, Legal Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Cases, Notice to Parties of Court Directed ADR Program, Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03, Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, upon Defendant Allergan USA, Inc. served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Cases, Notice to Parties of Court Directed ADR Program, Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03, Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, upon Defendant Allergan Inc. served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Cases, Notice to Parties of Court Directed ADR Program, Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03, Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02064 JLS(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00058 JLS(JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02321; 8:19-cv-02322; 8:19-cv-02323; 8:19-cv-02324 (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull, identifying Plaintiff Rachel Stull; Defendant Allergan Inc. f/k/a Inamed Corporation f/k/a McGhan Medical Corporation; Defendant Allergan PLC; Defendant Allergan USA, Inc.; Attorneys for Plaintiff Robinson Calcagnie, Inc. and Lenze Lawyers PLC. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25104798 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rachel Stull. (Attorney Mark P Robinson, Jr added to party Rachel Stull(pty:pla))(Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.