This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 10:25:41 (UTC).

Rachael A Wendel v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Rachael A Wendel filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01261

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rachael A Wendel

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy Dana Monge

Attorney at Law Offices of Martin Taller APC

2300 East Katella Avenue Suite 440

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney SA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

411 West 4Th Street Suite 8000

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4599

Marla K Letellier

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV20-1261 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/28/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel, (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27218445 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Rachael A Wendel(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less