This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 09:00:00 (UTC).

Raborg v. Cantor Fitzgerald Financial Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Raborg filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Cantor Fitzgerald Financial Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04402

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust

1191 E Newport Center Dr.Ste. 103

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-7714

Defendants

Jacqueline Hunter

Raju Hussain

Axel Theis

Russell Haley

Sergio Balbinot

Stephen Merkel

Dorival Dourado, Jr.

J.H. Whitney & Co., Inc.

Werner Zedelius

Michael Diekmann

Christof Mascher

Steven Bisgay

Oliver Baite

Robert M. Williams, Jr.

Cantor Fitzgerald Financial Corporation

Catherine Leftley

Ann K. Chun

Steven E. Rodgers

Angelo Sofocleous

16 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION - STATEMENT OF TRUTH & FACTS (Sworn, Notarized Statement). Document filed by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (sc) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/7/2021) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Appeal Package) (sac) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court dismisses this action without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1654. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, note service on the docket, and terminate any motions in this matter. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/7/2021) (sac) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Motion re: #6 MOTION re: to Subpoena. Document filed by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION re: to Subpoena. Document filed by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Christopher H. Raborg consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Oliver Baite, Sergio Balbinot, Steven Bisgay, Marc Boughton, CVR Capital Partners (U.S.), Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald Financial Corporation, Ann K. Chun, Calum Conway, Kevin J. Curley, Michael Diekmann, Dorival Dourado, Jr, Russell Haley, Jacqueline Hunter, Raju Hussain, J.H. Whitney & Co., Inc., Anshu Jain, Helga Jung, Catherine Leftley, Lauren Livingston, Howard W. Lutnick, David MacKenzie, Christof Mascher, Stephen Merkel, Annie Mills, Steven E. Rodgers, Angelo Sofocleous, Gunther Thallinger, Axel Theis, Nick Tulloch, Paul R. Vigano, Dieter Wemmer, Robert M. Williams, Jr, David J. Zatlukal, Werner Zedelius. Document filed by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Motion re: #1 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Document filed by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Christopher Henry Raborg, Trust. (Attachments: #1 Main Document) (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. is a litigant