This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:27 (UTC).

Rabenstein v. Hall et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Rabenstein filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos E. Mendoza and Daniel C. Irick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02302

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Rabenstein

Defendants

R & R Express, Inc.

Larry G. Hall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Paul Herman

Attorney at Newlin & Partners

Suite 300, 7335 West Sand Lake Road

Orlando, FL 32819

Kelley E. Lester

Attorney at Dan Newlin & Partners

7335 W. Sand Lake Rd., Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32819

Joseph Francis Scarpa, Jr.

Attorney at Dan Newlin Injury Attorneys

7335 W. Sand Lake Rd., Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant Attorneys

Libbie Reese

Attorney at Alvarez Winthrop Thompson & Storey PA

390 N Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-3511

Matthew Richard Schreck

Attorney at Alvarez Winthrop Thompson & Storey, PA

390 N Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

Jeffrey M. Thompson

Attorney at Alvarez Winthrop Thompson & Storey PA

390 N Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-3511

Pedro Raul Alvarez, Jr.

Attorney at Alvarez Winthrop Thompson & Storey PA

390 N Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-3511

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Schreck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Larry G. Hall, R & R Express, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate North American Risk Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Hallmark Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate R&R Express Holdco, Inc., Other Affiliate American Hallmark Insurance Comany for R & R Express, Inc... (Schreck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Jason Rabenstein. (Herman, Jason) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jason Rabenstein. Related case(s): no (Herman, Jason) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Larry G. Hall, R & R Express, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Schreck, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/31/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibits

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet Docket

1 #2

State Court ANSWER Answer

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuity of Florida, case number 2019 30641 CICI filed in State Court on 04/05/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16224266 filed by R & R Express, Inc., Larry G. Hall. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibits, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schreck, Matthew) Modified on 12/6/2019 (SPM). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE to counsel Kelley Lester of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copy emailed) (MAA) Modified on 1/28/2020 (MAA). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Schreck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Larry G. Hall, R & R Express, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate North American Risk Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Hallmark Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate R&R Express Holdco, Inc., Other Affiliate American Hallmark Insurance Comany for R & R Express, Inc... (Schreck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Jason Rabenstein. (Herman, Jason) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jason Rabenstein. Related case(s): no (Herman, Jason) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Larry G. Hall, R & R Express, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Schreck, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/31/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-2302-Orl-41DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuity of Florida, case number 2019 30641 CICI filed in State Court on 04/05/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16224266 filed by R & R Express, Inc., Larry G. Hall. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibits, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schreck, Matthew) Modified on 12/6/2019 (SPM). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less