This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 10:24:50 (UTC).

Ra-Amari et al v. RE/MAX, LLC et al

Case Summary

On September 16, 2022, James Ra-Amari, Misty Ra-Amari, and Rosemary Afful (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) represented by Paul K. Stafford of Stafford Moore, PLLC, filed a civil action against RE/MAX, LLC, EXP Realty, LLC, UMRE Investment Holdings, LLC, United Property Management, Cheng Cheng Lin, and Grand West Residential Condominium Association, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking compensatory, special, and punitive damages, economic damages for alleged violation of the Fair Housing Act, and infliction of emotional distress. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, with Judge David Hittner presiding.

Plaintiffs alleged that “Defendants have discriminated against Plaintiffs by refusing to sell Units to Plaintiffs, or by otherwise refusing to make available for sale Units when such dwellings were in fact so available, because of their race, color, religion, familial status or national origin, or by an intention to make any such preference, limitation, or discrimination in violation of the Fair Housing Act, 42 U.S.C. § 3604(a).”

The plaintiffs then alleged, “Defendants have discriminated against Plaintiffs by printing and publishing statements with respect to the sale of Units within the Grand West Condos that indicate a preference or limitation based on race, color, religion, sex, national origin and familial status, or an intention to make any such preference, limitation, or discrimination in violation of the Fair Housing Act, 42 U.S.C. § 3604(c).”

Plaintiffs asserted that “Plaintiffs are black and members of a protected class. Re/Max, EXP, UMRE, Grand West, and United Property Management denied Plaintiffs the opportunity to buy condos in Grand West Condos solely because of their race. The Plaintiffs being black was the motivating factor as to why Re/Max, EXP, UMRE, Grand West, and United Property Management discriminated against them. Due to the actions and inactions of Re/Max, EXP, UMRE, Grand West, and United Property Management as set forth above, Re/Max and United Property Management have violated the Fair Housing Act 42 U.S.C. § 3601, et seq., and 24 CFR 100.1, et seq.”

Plaintiffs also claimed that “Defendants engaged in extreme and outrageous conduct by denying Plaintiffs from engaging in the purchase of the condominiums in Grand West Condos due to their race. Defendants continued their extreme and outrageous conduct by intimating to them they were justified in their discrimination.”

The plaintiffs also alleged, “Defendants’ actions intentionally caused Plaintiffs severe emotion distress. Defendants’ actions were malicious and done solely due to Plaintiffs being black.”

Plaintiff listed two claims for relief, including claims for the alleged intentional infliction of emotional distress and alleged violation of the Fair Housing Act. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested an award for compensatory, special, and punitive damages, economic damages of approximately $2,000,000, punitive damages for egregious acts and omissions of defendants, and attorney’s fees for litigation. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03171

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Ra-Amari

Misty Ra-Amari

Rosemary Afful

Defendants

RE/MAX, LLC

EXP Realty, LLC

UMRE Investment Holdings, LLC

United Property Management

Cheng Cheng Lin

Grand West Residential Condominium Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul K. Stafford

Attorney at Stafford Moore, PLLC

325 N. St. Paul Street, Suite 2210

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Josie Lin Marketing Materials

1 #2

Exhibit Cheng Ching Lin

1 #3

Exhibit Grand West Condos Info Packet

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28782943) filed by Misty Ra-Amari, James Ra-Amari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Josie Lin Marketing Materials, #2 Exhibit Cheng Ching Lin, #3 Exhibit Grand West Condos Info Packet)(Stafford, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXP Realty, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RE/MAX, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul K Stafford