This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2021 at 11:22:36 (UTC).

R2 Solutions LLC v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 R2 Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R2 Solutions LLC

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent Nelson Bumgardner

Edward R Nelson, III

Marcus Hill Brakefield

Christopher G Granaghan

Andrew J Wright

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Hugh Findlay

Debra Elaine Gunter

 

Court Documents

#1

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Walmart Inc. to 4/8/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Walmart Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Walmart Inc. to 3/24/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(mcg) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Walmart Inc.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Hill Brakefield on behalf of R2 Solutions LLC (Brakefield, Marcus) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher G Granaghan on behalf of R2 Solutions LLC (Granaghan, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew J Wright on behalf of R2 Solutions LLC (Wright, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Walmart Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of R2 Solutions LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Walmart Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8224758.), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less