On November 29, 2021, R2 Solutions LLC (“R2 Solutions” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Edward R. Nelson, III of Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (“State Farm” or “Defendant”), seeking damages along with pre- and post-judgement interest and other reliefs for the Defendant’s alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III presiding.
The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 8,190,610 (“the ’610 patent”), United States Patent No. 7,370,011 (“the ’011 patent”), and United States Patent No. 7,698,329 (“the ’329 patent”) (collectively, the “Patents-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.
In their complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “State Farm has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’610 patent. State Farm has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 1–5, 17–21, 33–34, 40–41 of the ’610 patent by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using the State Farm data analytics system built on Apache Hadoop. State Farm is liable for its infringements of the ’610 patent. R2 Solutions has been damaged as a result of State Farm’s infringing conduct.”
The Plaintiff further alleged that, “State Farm has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’011 patent in this District and elsewhere in Texas and the United States by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using the State Farm banking/investment platform.State Farm is liable for its infringements of the ’011 patent. R2 Solutions has been damaged as a result of State Farm’s infringing conduct.”
The Plaintiff also alleged that, “State Farm has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’329 patent. State Farm has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 1, 4–5, 8, and 11–12 of the ’329 patent by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using the State Farm.com search engine. State Farm is liable for its infringements of the ’329 patent. R2 Solutions has been damaged as a result of State Farm’s infringing conduct.”
There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which deal with the alleged infringement of the Patents-in-Suit owned by the Plaintiff.
In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for an order that State Farm has directly infringed one or more claims of each of the patents-in-suit; an order that State Farm must pay R2 Solutions past and future damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284, including supplemental damages arising from any continuing, post-verdict infringement for the time between trial and entry of the final judgment; and an accounting and an order that State Farm must pay R2 Solutions pre- and post-judgment interest on the damages award along with such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper.
This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.
4:21-CV-00941
11/29/2021
Disposed - Other Disposed
Intellectual Property - Patent
Amos L. Mazzant, III
R2 Solutions LLC
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Edward R Nelson, III
(#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned action are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/6/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
Text of Proposed Order
(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by R2 Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
Exhibit 7
Exhibit 6
Exhibit 5
Exhibit 4
Exhibit 3
Exhibit 2
Exhibit 1
Civil Cover Sheet
(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8688869.), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
Docket(#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned action are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/6/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by R2 Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8688869.), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
[-] Read Less