This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 09:01:33 (UTC).

R2 Solutions LLC v. Redfin Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 R2 Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Redfin Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00945

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R2 Solutions LLC

Defendant

Redfin Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward R Nelson, III

Brent Nelson Bumgardner

Carder W. Brooks

Christopher G Granaghan

John Paul Murphy

Defendant Attorney

Deron R Dacus

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Redfin Corporation.( Dacus, Deron) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened pdf on 1/25/2022) (mem). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by R2 Solutions LLC. Redfin Corporation served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Redfin Corporation.( Dacus, Deron) Modified on 1/11/2022 (gsg). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Redfin Corporation. (mem) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

1 #11

Exhibit 10

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Redfin Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8689051.), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2022

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Redfin Corporation to 2/28/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(mem) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Redfin Corporation.( Dacus, Deron) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened pdf on 1/25/2022) (mem). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by R2 Solutions LLC. Redfin Corporation served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Extension of Time submitted, Docket Entry #5 . Filed in error by attorney. Disregard. (gsg) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Redfin Corporation.( Dacus, Deron) Modified on 1/11/2022 (gsg). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Redfin Corporation. (mem) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mem) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Redfin Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8689051.), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less