This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:55:28 (UTC).

R2 Solutions LLC v. iHeartMedia, INC.

Case Summary

On June 1, 2021, R2 Solutions LLC (“Plaintiff” or “R2 Solutions”), represented by Brent N. Bumgardner, Christopher Granaghan and Edward Nelson, III of Nelson Bumgardner Casto, PC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against iHeartMedia, Inc. (“iHeartMedia” or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory and compensatory relief, along with reasonable ongoing royalties for the alleged patent infringement of innovations associated with Yahoo! Search, owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the Defendant’s infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,698,329 (“the ’329 patent”) entitled, “Method for Improving Quality of Search Results by Avoiding Indexing Sections of Pages.”, 8,341,157 (“the ’157 patent”) entitled, “System and Method for Intent-Driven Search Result Presentation.” and 8,190,610 (“the ’610 patent”) entitled, “MapReduce for Distributed Database Processing” (Collectively as the “patents-in-suit”).

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “iHeartMedia has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the patents-in-suit in this District and elsewhere in Texas and the United States. To this end, iHeartMedia has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 1 and 4–5 of the ’329 patent, claims 1–5 and 11 of the ’157 patent and claims 1–5, 17–21, 33–34, and 40–41 of the ’610 patent by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using the iHeartRadio application and iHeartMedia data analytics system built on Apache Hadoop.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Despite having knowledge of the ’157 patent, iHeartMedia has specifically intended, and continues to specifically intend, for persons (including customers and end users) who subscribe to/acquire and/or use the iHeartRadio platform to use the iHeartRadio platform (which is stored on one or more computer readable media) such that those persons (including customers and end users) infringe claim 2 of the ’157 patent. This is evident when iHeartMedia encourages and instructs persons (including customers and end users) in the use and operation of the iHeartRadio platform, including the use of the search feature.”

The Plaintiff lists out three claims for relief. The claims are for the alleged infringement of ’329 Patent, ’157 Patent and ’610 patent, respectively, wherein the Plaintiff claimed that, iHeartMedia is liable for its alleged infringements of the patents-in-suit pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271. 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to adjudicate that iHeartMedia has directly infringed one or more claims of each of the patents-in-suit, order iHeartMedia to pay R2 Solutions past and future damages, including supplemental damages arising from any continuing, post-verdict infringement for the time between trial and entry of the final judgment, together with an accounting, as needed, as provided under 35 U.S.C. § 284; reasonable ongoing royalties on a go-forward basis after Final Judgment and prejudgment and post-judgment interest on the damages awarded and award costs of litigation to Plaintiff.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00552

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R2 Solutions LLC

Defendant

iHEARTMEDIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M. Hill Brakefield

Brent N. Bumgardner

Christopher Granaghan

Edward Nelson, III

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Hill Brakefield on behalf of R2 Solutions LLC. Attorney M. Hill Brakefield added to party R2 Solutions LLC(pty:pla) (Brakefield, M.) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) Terminated on refiling (lad). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by R2 Solutions LLC. iHeartMedia, Inc. served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent N. Bumgardner on behalf of R2 Solutions LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Granaghan on behalf of R2 Solutions LLC (Granaghan, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to iHEARTMEDIA, INC.. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by R2 Solutions LLC. to iHeartMedia, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14864153), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less