This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 08:14:51 (UTC).

R2 Solutions LLC v. GameStop Corp et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 R2 Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GameStop Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02870

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R2 Solutions LLC

Defendants

GameStop Corp

GameStop Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward R Nelson, III

Brent N Bumgardner

Carder Wright Brooks

Christopher Granaghan

John Paul Murphy

Defendant Attorney

Adrienne E Dominguez

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GameStop Corp, GameStop Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Adrienne E Dominguez added to party GameStop Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Adrienne E Dominguez added to party GameStop Inc(pty:dft) (Dominguez, Adrienne) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER: In light of related litigation involving the Plaintiff in the Court of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer, the Court reassigns this case to Judge Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/11/2023) (twd) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to GameStop Inc ; served on 12/29/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to GameStop Corp ; served on 12/29/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to GameStop Corp, GameStop Inc. (mms) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mms) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/22/2022) (mms). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R2 Solutions LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO 120) filed by R2 Solutions LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

1 #11

Exhibit(s) 10

1 #10

Exhibit(s) 9

1 #8

Exhibit(s) 7

1 #7

Exhibit(s) 6

1 #6

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #10 Defendants GameStop Corp. and GameStop, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, to and including February 21, 2023, is GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/20/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GameStop Corp, GameStop Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Adrienne E Dominguez added to party GameStop Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Adrienne E Dominguez added to party GameStop Inc(pty:dft) (Dominguez, Adrienne) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: In light of related litigation involving the Plaintiff in the Court of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer, the Court reassigns this case to Judge Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/11/2023) (twd) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to GameStop Inc ; served on 12/29/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to GameStop Corp ; served on 12/29/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to GameStop Corp, GameStop Inc. (mms) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mms) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/22/2022) (mms). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R2 Solutions LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO 120) filed by R2 Solutions LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against GameStop Corp, GameStop Inc filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13392455) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10) (Nelson, Edward) Modified text on 12/22/2022 (mms). (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less