This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 08:20:48 (UTC).

R2 Solutions LLC v. Fedex Corporate Services, Inc.,

Case Summary

On November 29, 2021, R2 Solutions LLC (“R2 Solutions” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Edward R. Nelson, III of Nelson Bumgardner Conroy, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. (“FedEx Services” or “Defendant”), seeking damages along with pre- and post-judgment interest and other reliefs for the Defendant’s alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in tU.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III presiding. 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 8,190,610 (“the ’610 patent”), United States Patent No. 8,341,157 (“the ’157 patent”), and United States Patent No. 7,698,329 (“the ’329 patent”) (collectively, the “Patents-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff. 

In their complaint, the Plaintiff alleged, “FedEx Services has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’610 patent. FedEx Services has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 1–5, 17–21, 33–34, 40–41 of the ’610 patent by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using the FedEx Services data analytics system built on Apache Hadoop. FedEx Services is liable for its infringements of the ’610 patent.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “FedEx Services has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’157 patent. FedEx Services has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 1–5 and 7–10 of the ’157 patent by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using the FedEx.com search and/or tracking engine. FedEx Services is liable for its infringements of the ’157. R2 Solutions has been damaged as a result of FedEx Services’ infringing conduct. “

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “FedEx Services has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’329 patent.FedEx Services has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 1, 4–5, 8, and 11–12 of the ’329 patent by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using the FedEx.com search and/or tracking engine. FedEx Services is liable for its infringements of the ’329 patent. R2 Solutions has been damaged as a result of FedEx Services’ infringing conduct.”

There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which deal with the alleged infringement of the Patents-in-Suit owned by the Plaintiff. 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for an order that FedEx Services has directly infringed one or more claims of each of the patents-in-suit and an order that FedEx Services must pay R2 Solutions past and future damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284, including supplemental damages arising from any continuing, post-verdict infringement for the time between trial and entry of the final judgment, together with an accounting along with pre- and post-judgement interest. The Plaintiff also requested the Court for any such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00940

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R2 Solutions LLC

Defendant

Fedex Corporate Services, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward R Nelson, III

Brent Nelson Bumgardner

Carder W. Brooks

Christopher G Granaghan

John Paul Murphy

Defendant Attorney

Eric Hugh Findlay

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Fedex Corporate Services, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8688734.), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #7

Exhibit 6

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by R2 Solutions LLC. Fedex Corporate Services, Inc., served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by R2 Solutions LLC. Fedex Corporate Services, Inc., served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fedex Corporate Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R2 Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for R2 Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Fedex Corporate Services, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8688734.), filed by R2 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less