This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2022 at 09:25:24 (UTC).

R. v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On August 17, 2022, T.R., individually and as next friend to minor child E.R., (“Plaintiff”), represented by Christopher A. Seeger and Christopher L. Ayers of Seeger Weiss LLP; Glenn Draper, Laura R. Garrett and Matthew P. Bergman of Social Media Victims Law Center PLLC; and Robert H. Klonoff, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc., formerly known as Facebook, Inc.; Instagram; Facebook; Snap, Inc.; TikTok Inc.; and ByteDance Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for Defendants’ manufacture of allegedly defective products that caused injuries to E.R. This case was filed in U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with Judge Jacqueline S. Corley presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “This product liability action seeks to hold Defendants’ Instagram, Facebook, Snapchat, and TikTok products responsible for causing and contributing to the burgeoning mental health crisis perpetrated upon the children and teenagers of the United States and, specifically for the injuries they caused E.R. beginning in or around 2017, when she was only twelve years old.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “Defendants have invested billions of dollars to design and develop their products to encourage, enable, and push content to children and teenagers that Defendants know to be problematic and highly detrimental to their minor users’ mental health.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Each of Defendants’ products contains unique product features which are intended to and do encourage addiction, and unlawful content and use of said products, to the detriment of their minor users.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “Defendants target and market their products to children and teens, design their platforms around sunk cost and network effect principles – which designs are not known to ordinary and reasonable consumers – for the express purpose of locking in minor users so that they continue to use Defendants’ products, no matter the cost to those same minor users’ health and well-being.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendants have knowledge about the harms their products cause users, particularly teen, child, and other vulnerable user populations, and all Defendants continue to operate those products in a harmful and dangerous manner anyway and in the interest of competing with one another and increasing already astronomical profits.”

Plaintiff claimed, “The more E.R. became dependent on Defendants’ products, the harder it became for her to put them down, to the point where she began having difficulty sleeping at night.”

The plaintiff additionally claimed, “Defendants’ apps and recommendation technologies identified and directed exceedingly and unacceptably harmful content to E.R., exploiting her vulnerabilities due to age and gender. This encouraged her to engage in harmful food-related behaviors. Defendants’ harmful design and operation of their social media products directly caused and resulted in E.R.’s eating disorder and mental health decline”

Plaintiff presented seven claims for relief, including for alleged strict product liability-design defect and failure to warn, negligence, violations of California’s Unfair Competition Law, unjust enrichment, invasion of privacy and sex discrimination. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment for injunctive relief, along with an award for monetary and punitive damages; past and future medical expenses, including reasonable costs; and attorney and expert fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04712

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T. R.

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook, Inc.

Snap, Inc.

Tiktok Inc.

ByteDance Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher L Ayers

Attorney at Seeger Weiss LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Fl.

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

Christopher A. Seeger

Attorney at Seeger Weiss LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

Glenn Draper

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center

821 Second Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Matthew P Bergman

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center PLLC

821 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Robert H. Klonoff

2425 S.W. 76Th Ave.

Portland, OR 97225

Laura R. Garrett

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center

1390 Market Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin A. Linsley

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Rosemarie Theresa Ring

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #12 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok Inc., ByteDance Inc. and T.R.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) Modified on 9/12/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Entities by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#10

(#10) Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Meta Platforms, Inc. by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Theresa Ring (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. R.. All Defendants. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 9/2/2022) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., Tiktok Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

6 #1

Snap, TikTok, ByteDance

6 #6

Main Document

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

5 #5

Main Document

#3

(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by T. R... (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

2 #3

TikTok

2 #2

Snap

2 #1

Meta

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #12 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok Inc., ByteDance Inc. and T.R.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) Modified on 9/12/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Entities by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Meta Platforms, Inc. by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Theresa Ring (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. R.. All Defendants. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 9/2/2022) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., Tiktok Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Snap, TikTok, ByteDance)(Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 8/18/2022) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by T. R. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by T. R... (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Meta, #2 Snap, #3 TikTok)(Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ByteDance Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., Tiktok Inc. with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17450203.). Filed by T. R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 8/17/2022) Modified on 8/18/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TikTok, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SNAP INC. is a litigant