This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:08 (UTC).

R. v. Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 R filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci G Cornelius. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00752

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci G Cornelius

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea R.

Defendants

Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama

Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashley Rose Rhea

Attorney at RHEA LAW LLC

104 23Rd Street South, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35233

Defendant Attorneys

William Lee Gilmer

Attorney at WHITE ARNOLD & DOWD, P.C.

2025 Third Avenue North, Ste. 500

Birmingham, AL 35203

John F Whitaker

Attorney at DIOCESE OF BIRMINGHAM IN ALABAMA

2121 3Rd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea R.. Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Rhea, Ashley) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea R.. Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Rhea, Ashley) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#12

(#12) Joint REPLY in Support of #6 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School. (Gilmer, William) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#13

(#13) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/9/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Andrea R.. (Rhea, Ashley) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School. (Gilmer, William) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 29, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 29, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on July 8, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/14/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER- It is ORDERED that the pltf shall file a response to the motion for more definite statement (Doc #6 ) within fourteen (14) calendar days; The response shall be limited to fifteen (15) pages; The defts shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days thereafter; Any reply shall be limited to ten (10) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/14/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School, returned to pltf for service (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrea R..(MRR, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/9/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint REPLY in Support of #6 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School. (Gilmer, William) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER: the telephone status conference set for 10:30 a.m. on July 8, 2019; is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/3/2019. (MSN) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Andrea R.. (Rhea, Ashley) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 29, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 29, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on July 8, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/14/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER- It is ORDERED that the pltf shall file a response to the motion for more definite statement (Doc #6 ) within fourteen (14) calendar days; The response shall be limited to fifteen (15) pages; The defts shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days thereafter; Any reply shall be limited to ten (10) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/14/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School. (Gilmer, William) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea R.. Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Rhea, Ashley) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea R.. Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Rhea, Ashley) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Diocese of Birmingham In Alabama, Sacred Heart of Jesus Catholic School, returned to pltf for service (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3349339 (B4601097786). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrea R..(MRR, ). (Rhea, Ashley) Modified on 5/20/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrea R..(MRR, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less