This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2020 at 08:47:05 (UTC).

QURESHI v. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 QURESHI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01141

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAAZ QURESHI

Defendant

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tram T. Pham

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Roy T. Willey, IV

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm, LLC

32 Ann St

Charleston, SC 29403

Curtis Aaron Boykin

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Frederick Arnold Douglas

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Eric Poulin

Attorney at ANASTOPOULO LAW FIRM

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle Yvette Conley

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Alan E. Schoenfeld

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR, LLP

250 Greenwich Street, 7 World Trade Center

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MOTION to Certify Class and/or Appointment of Class Counsel by MAAZ QURESHI (Boykin, Curtis) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#20

(#20) Memorandum in opposition to re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by MAAZ QURESHI. (Boykin, Curtis) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Arnold Douglas on behalf of MAAZ QURESHI (Douglas, Frederick) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E. Schoenfeld on behalf of AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Schoenfeld, Alan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alan E. Schoenfeld, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7266089. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Conley, Danielle) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order

14 #1

Memorandum in Support

#14

(#14) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Conley, Danielle) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to AMERICAN UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) ERRATA re Complaint by MAAZ QURESHI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pham, Tram) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#3

MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#2

MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7080982) filed by Maaz Qureshi. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pham, Tram) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Certify Class and/or Appointment of Class Counsel by MAAZ QURESHI (Boykin, Curtis) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Memorandum in opposition to re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by MAAZ QURESHI. (Boykin, Curtis) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Arnold Douglas on behalf of MAAZ QURESHI (Douglas, Frederick) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E. Schoenfeld on behalf of AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Schoenfeld, Alan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/26/20. (lccrc1) Modified on 6/26/2020 (lsj). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER finding as moot #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying without prejudice #16 Motion to Dismiss: Defendant's #15 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DENIED as moot and Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DENIED without prejudice. The Court apologizes for having overlooked the former until the filing of the latter. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within either (1) 30 days after the filing of any consolidated amended complaint in the cases identified in Defendant's #14 Motion to Consolidate, or (2) 30 days after that motion is denied. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/26/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alan E. Schoenfeld, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7266089. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Conley, Danielle) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Danielle Y. Conley in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Conley, Danielle) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conley, Danielle) Modified event on 6/17/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Conley, Danielle) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy Willey on behalf of MAAZ QURESHI (Willey, Roy) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Poulin on behalf of MAAZ QURESHI (Poulin, Eric) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to AMERICAN UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRATA re Complaint by MAAZ QURESHI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pham, Tram) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Roy T. Willey, IV, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7081037. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Maaz Qureshi (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric M. Poulin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7081008. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Maaz Qureshi (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7080982) filed by Maaz Qureshi. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pham, Tram) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tram T. Pham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Curtis Aaron Boykin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Arnold Douglas Esquire