This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 07:24:17 (UTC).

Quint v. Martin et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Quint filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Martin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah A. L. Merriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01695

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah A. L. Merriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard R. Quint

Bridgeport, CT 06604

Defendants

Martin

Hackett

Spiedght

Raden

Tara Philips

Spieght

King

Jones

Jack Russo

Prison Medical Providers

Kara Philips

Tracy Paterson

Jacko Russo

Jesse

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard R. Quint (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Letter from Richard Quint Dated 1/17/22 Re: Status of Case (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#10

(#10) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hackett, Jones, King, Martin, Tracy Paterson, Kara Philips, Prison Medical Providers, Raden, Jacko Russo, Spieght, Jesse, filed by Richard R. Quint.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard R. Quint. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hackett, Martin, Raden, Spieght, King, Jones, Jack Russo, Prison Medical Providers, Kara Philips, Tracy Paterson, filed by Richard R. Quint. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard R. Quint. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#2

(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard R. Quint. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Exhibits

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard R. Quint (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard R. Quint. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Letter, #2 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard R. Quint. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter from Richard Quint Dated 1/17/22 Re: Status of Case (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #9 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a ledger sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 2/2/2022 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 1/12/22.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hackett, Jones, King, Martin, Tracy Paterson, Kara Philips, Prison Medical Providers, Raden, Jacko Russo, Spieght, Jesse, filed by Richard R. Quint.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard R. Quint. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard R. Quint. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hackett, Martin, Raden, Spieght, King, Jones, Jack Russo, Prison Medical Providers, Kara Philips, Tracy Paterson, filed by Richard R. Quint. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard R. Quint. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard R. Quint. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard R. Quint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Martin is a litigant