This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2021 at 16:11:52 (UTC).

QUINN v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 QUINN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02768

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW QUINN

Fairfax, VA 22031

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANDREW QUINN. (znmw) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/08/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/08/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/08/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/08/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANDREW QUINN. (znmw) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by ANDREW QUINN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(znmw) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/18/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmw) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant