This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 10:09:30 (UTC).

Quincy Bioscience, LLC v. Francis Ortiz, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Quincy Bioscience, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Francis Ortiz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00271

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quincy Bioscience, LLC

Defendants

Francis Ortiz, an individual d/b/a "Marvelous Heart & Soul" and "Beauty and Health 4 Life"

Ana Paula Santos, an individual d/b/a "Marvelous Heart & Soul" and "Beauty and Health 4 Life"

Francis Ortiz

Ana Paula Santos

Francis Ortiz An individual doing business as Marvelous Heart & Soul doing business as Beauty and Health 4 Life

Ana Paula Santos An individual doing business as Marvelous Heart & Soul doing business as Beauty and Health 4 Life

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanjay Satish Karnik

Attorney at Amin Talati Wasserman LLP

100 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (voc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Filing of Report on Action Regarding a Trademark. (Karnik, Sanjay) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Karnik, Sanjay) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

2 #1

Summons Ana Paula Santos

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Francis Ortiz, Ana Paula Santos. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ana Paula Santos) (voc) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

1 #4

Summons for Signature by Clerk - Defendant Ana Paula Santos

1 #3

Summons for Signature by Clerk - Defendant Francis Ortiz

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Ex. A - PREVAGEN Trademark Registration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Unjust Enrichment, Trademark Infringement and Related Claims against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2650580.), filed by Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - PREVAGEN Trademark Registration, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for Signature by Clerk - Defendant Francis Ortiz, #4 Summons for Signature by Clerk - Defendant Ana Paula Santos) (Karnik, Sanjay) Modified on 3/25/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. Corrected both defendants and stats. (lak) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (voc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Filing of Report on Action Regarding a Trademark. (Karnik, Sanjay) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Karnik, Sanjay) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketAction Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (voc) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Francis Ortiz, Ana Paula Santos. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ana Paula Santos) (voc) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc/aw) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Unjust Enrichment, Trademark Infringement and Related Claims against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2650580.), filed by Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - PREVAGEN Trademark Registration, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for Signature by Clerk - Defendant Francis Ortiz, #4 Summons for Signature by Clerk - Defendant Ana Paula Santos) (Karnik, Sanjay) Modified on 3/25/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. Corrected both defendants and stats. (lak) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less